EMB INTERNATIONAL LLC v. TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: EMB INTERNATIONAL LLC D/B/A CAFE GEORGETOWN and EMB INTERNATIONAL LLC
Defendant: THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO. and HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03762
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2020 (zjch)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' #10 Notice of Settlement, the briefing schedule for the defendants' #5 Partial Motion to Dismiss is STAYED through March 10, 2020. The parties shall file, on or before March 10, 2020, a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 10, 2020. (lcdlf1)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Klepper, Steven)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' #9 Second Consent Motion for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion for Partial Dismissal. The plaintiff shall respond to the defendants' #5 Motion for Partial Dismissal on or before February 10, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 22, 2020. (lcdlf1)
January 20, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Klepper, Steven)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #8 Consent Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion for Partial Dismissal. The plaintiff shall respond to the defendant's #5 Motion for Partial Dismissal on or before January 20, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 6, 2020. (lcdlf1)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO. (Klepper, Steven)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Amended Notice) by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Klepper, Steven)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (Certificate of Service) by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY re #5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss (Klepper, Steven)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Klepper, Steven)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Klepper on behalf of HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Klepper, Steven) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/19/2019) (zeg).
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb)
December 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Klepper, Steven)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 006269 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-6654991 filed by THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO., TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Complaint, #2 Superior Court Documents Complaint Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #3 Superior Court Documents Complaint Exhibit B - Invoices, #4 Superior Court Documents Complaint Exhibit C - Email, #5 Superior Court Documents Complaint Exhibit D - Correspondence, #6 Superior Court Documents Exhibit E - Email, #7 Superior Court Documents Summons to Twin City Fire Insurance Company, #8 Superior Court Documents Summons to "Hartford Life and Accident Co.", #9 Superior Court Documents Superior Court Civil Cover Sheets, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klepper, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMB INTERNATIONAL LLC v. TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO.
Represented By: Steven M. Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Steven M. Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT CO.
Represented By: Steven M. Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Steven M. Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMB INTERNATIONAL LLC D/B/A CAFE GEORGETOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMB INTERNATIONAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?