VALLE et al v. KARAGOUNIS et al
Plaintiff: Alejandra Plazas, Necty Gasca, Claudia C Gasca LeBaigue, Diana C Valle, DIANA C. VALLE and CLAUDIA C. GASCA LEBAIGUE
Defendant: Antonis Karagounis, Panorama Productions and ReWind By Decades
Case Number: 1:2019cv03764
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. REWIND BY DECADES served on 1/2/2020, answer due 2/21/2020 (Ferron, Claudette)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PANORAMA PRODUCTIONS served on 1/2/2020, answer due 2/21/2020 (Ferron, Claudette)
January 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to Complaint due by 2/21/2020. (zcdw)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint by February 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 13, 2020. (lccjn2)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by ANTONIS KARAGOUNIS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order to Defendants' Consent Motion)(Krause, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONIS KARAGOUNIS served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020 (Ferron, Claudette)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #3 Summons Returned Executed was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. Defendant served should be selected and service date entered. (eg)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Ferron, Claudette) Modified on 1/2/2020 (eg).
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to REWIND BY DECADES, ANTONIS KARAGOUNIS, PANORAMA PRODUCTIONS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint against Antonis Karagounis, Panorama Productions, ReWind By Decades with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6655982) filed by Diana C Valle, Alejandra Plazas, Claudia C Gasca LeBaigue, Necty Gasca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ReWind By Decades -Summons, #3 Summons Antonis Karagounis -Summons, #4 Summons Panorama Productions)(Ferron, Claudette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALLE et al v. KARAGOUNIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Plazas
Represented By: Claudette V. Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Necty Gasca
Represented By: Claudette V. Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia C Gasca LeBaigue
Represented By: Claudette V. Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana C Valle
Represented By: Claudette V. Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA C. VALLE
Represented By: Claudette V. Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA C. GASCA LEBAIGUE
Represented By: Claudette V. Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonis Karagounis
Represented By: Robert Scott Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panorama Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReWind By Decades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?