APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: KINGS DAUGHTERS MEDICAL CENTER, T.J. SAMSON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC., MURRAY-CALLOWAY COUNTY HOSPITAL and KING'S DAUGHTERS' MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03775
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Orloff, Serena)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/7/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2020. (Sidhu, Amandeep)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/08/2020. (Sidhu, Amandeep)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/7/2020 (Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Wintergerst on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wintergerst, Jennifer)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Price, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Price, Stephen)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 #12 Motions for Leave of Stephen R. Price, Sr. and Jennifer L. Wintergerst to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/27/19. (DMK)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer L. Wintergerst, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6671452. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC., KINGS DAUGHTERS MEDICAL CENTER, MURRAY-CALLOWAY COUNTY HOSPITAL, T.J. SAMSON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jennifer Wintergerst)(Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen R. Price, Sr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6671428. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC., KINGS DAUGHTERS MEDICAL CENTER, MURRAY-CALLOWAY COUNTY HOSPITAL, T.J. SAMSON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stephen R. Price, Sr.)(Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #8 #9 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with the specific requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), in particular subpart (4) which requires a certification that an attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar and the circumstances of any discipline. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/20/19. (DMK)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Wintergerst, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6660400. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC., KINGS DAUGHTERS MEDICAL CENTER, MURRAY-CALLOWAY COUNTY HOSPITAL, T.J. SAMSON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration J. Wintergerst, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen Price, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-6660316. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC., KINGS DAUGHTERS MEDICAL CENTER, MURRAY-CALLOWAY COUNTY HOSPITAL, T.J. SAMSON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration S. Price, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amandeep S. Sidhu on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by T.J. SAMSON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MURRAY-CALLOWAY COUNTY HOSPITAL (Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KINGS DAUGHTERS MEDICAL CENTER (Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC. (Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Sidhu, Amandeep)
December 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Defendant Alex Azar ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6660201) filed by MURRAY-CALLOWAY COUNTY HOSPITAL, APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC., KINGS DAUGHTERS MEDICAL CENTER, T.J. SAMSON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Alex Azar Civil Summons, #7 Summons Civil Process Clerk Civil Summons, #8 Summons US AG Civil Summons, #9 Supplement LCvR 26.1 (Appalachian Regional), #10 Supplement LCvR 26.1 (King's Daughters), #11 Supplement LCvR 26.1 (Murray-Calloway), #12 Supplement LCvR 26.1 (TJ Samson))(Sidhu, Amandeep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINGS DAUGHTERS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Amandeep S. Sidhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.J. SAMSON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Amandeep S. Sidhu
Represented By: Jennifer L. Wintergerst
Represented By: Stephen R. Price, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Amandeep S. Sidhu
Represented By: Jennifer L. Wintergerst
Represented By: Stephen R. Price, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURRAY-CALLOWAY COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Amandeep S. Sidhu
Represented By: Jennifer L. Wintergerst
Represented By: Stephen R. Price, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KING'S DAUGHTERS' MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Amandeep S. Sidhu
Represented By: Jennifer L. Wintergerst
Represented By: Stephen R. Price, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?