DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Case Number: 1:2019cv03776
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2020. (tb)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 3/2/2020. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/27/2020. (DJS)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR.(Mussenden, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/22/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/23/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 12/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Thurston, Robin)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Thurston, Robin)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6661303) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Thurston, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Represented By: Robin Frances Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Paul A. Mussenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?