HOOD v. CITY OF CHICAGO
Plaintiff: TYRONE HOOD
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO, ELIZABETH SHINN, MICHAEL CLANCY, JOHN STOUT, JAMES O'BRIEN, BERNARD RYAN, JOHN BALL, ROBERT LENIHAN, GERALD CARROLL, JOHN POLUSZNY, KENNETH BOUDREAU and JOHN HALLORAN
Not Yet Classified: NICHOLAS SCHMIDLE
Case Number: 1:2019mc00123
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Schmidle's Motion to Quash filed by JOHN BALL, KENNETH BOUDREAU, GERALD CARROLL, MICHAEL CLANCY, JOHN HALLORAN, ROBERT LENIHAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JOHN POLUSZNY, BERNARD RYAN, ELIZABETH SHINN, JOHN STOUT. (Moran, Patrick)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by NICHOLAS SCHMIDLE. (Bowman, Chad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1 MOTION TO QUASH (Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 4616099752) MOTION for Protective Order filed by NICHOLAS SCHMIDLE. (Bowman, Chad)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Heather Lewis Donnell is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/06/2019. (lcapm2)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Heather Lewis Donnell, :Firm- Loevy & Loevy, :Address- 311 N Aberdeen St., 3rd Floor, Chicago, IL 60607. Phone No. - 312-243-5900. Fax No. - 312-243-5902 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by TYRONE HOOD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Heather Lewis Donnell, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Payment)(Wayne, Merrick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1 MOTION TO QUASH (Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 4616099752) MOTION for Protective Order, #6 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Transfer and in Support of their Opposition to Non-Party Nicholas Schmidle's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order filed by JOHN BALL, KENNETH BOUDREAU, GERALD CARROLL, MICHAEL CLANCY, JOHN HALLORAN, ROBERT LENIHAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JOHN POLUSZNY, BERNARD RYAN, ELIZABETH SHINN, JOHN STOUT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R)(Rock, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case by JOHN BALL, KENNETH BOUDREAU, GERALD CARROLL, MICHAEL CLANCY, JOHN HALLORAN, ROBERT LENIHAN, JAMES O'BRIEN, JOHN POLUSZNY, BERNARD RYAN, ELIZABETH SHINN, JOHN STOUT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit Exhibit R)(Rock, John)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion does not comply with Local Rule requirements to submit: a motion signed by a sponsoring member of the Bar of this Court, accompanied by a declaration by the non-member that sets forth: (1) the full name of the attorney; (2) the attorney's office address and telephone number; (3) a list of all bars to which the attorney has been admitted; (4) a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline; (5) the number of times the attorney has been admitted pro hac vice in this Court within the last two years; and (6) whether the attorney, if the attorney engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia, is a member of the District of Columbia Bar or has an application for membership pending. See Local Rule 83.2(d). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/5/2019. (lcapm2)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION TO QUASH (Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 4616099752) MOTION for Protective Order filed by TYRONE HOOD. (Wayne, Merrick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Heather Lewis Donnell, :Firm- Loevy & Loevy, :Address- 311 N Aberdeen St., 3rd Floor, Chicago, IL 60607. Phone No. - 312-243-5900. Fax No. - 312-789-4955 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6300411. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TYRONE HOOD (Wayne, Merrick)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 Notice of Appearance; emailed to jrock@rfclaw.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI - Pursuant to instructions on court's website. Parties are to be added in all caps. (zjf, )
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Patrick R. Moran is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/2/2019. (lcapm2)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Patrick R. Moran, :Firm- Rock, Fusco & Connelly, LLC, :Address- 321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2200, Chicago, IL 60654. Phone No. - (312) 494-1000. Fax No. - (312) 494-1001 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6289320. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by John Ball, Kenneth Boudreau, Gerald Carroll, Michael Clancy, John Halloran, Robert Lenihan, James O'Brien, John Poluszny, Bernard Ryan, Elizabeth Shinn, John Stout (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick R. Moran)(Rock, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Rock on behalf of Kenneth Boudreau, John Halloran, Bernard Ryan, Robert Lenihan, John Poluszny, Michael Clancy, John Ball, James O'Brien, Gerald Carroll, Elizabeth Shinn, John Stout (Rock, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/31/2019) (zjf).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 4616099752) filed by NICHOLAS SCHMIDLE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Declaration, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(jf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOOD v. CITY OF CHICAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NICHOLAS SCHMIDLE
Represented By: Chad R. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH SHINN
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CLANCY
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN STOUT
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES O'BRIEN
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD RYAN
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BALL
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LENIHAN
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD CARROLL
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN POLUSZNY
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH BOUDREAU
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HALLORAN
Represented By: John Joseph Rock
Represented By: Patrick R. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE HOOD
Represented By: Heather Lewis Donnell
Represented By: Merrick Jason Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?