CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS et al v. CONTRERAS
Plaintiff: XIU JIAN SUN and CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS
Defendant: RUDOLPH CONTRERAS
Case Number: 1:2020cv00197
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RUDOLPH CONTRERAS served on 1/31/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/31/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/31/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/31/2020.) "Let this be filed" Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/03/2020 (jf)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/04/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS, XIU JIAN SUN. Case related to Case No. 19cv2886 (RC), 18cv2820 (RC), and 17cv1787 (RC). (ztth)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RUDOLPH CONTRERAS (Filing fee $400, receipt number 4616102186) with Jury Demand filed by CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS, XIU JIAN SUN. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ztth)
January 21, 2020 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to RUDOLPH CONTRERAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS et al v. CONTRERAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIU JIAN SUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUDOLPH CONTRERAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?