INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION et al v. NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY), SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP), INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS), SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF) and SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP)
Defendant: NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD
Intervenor: ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD CO., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD CO., CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO and NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Amicus Curiae: NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINSMEN DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS and INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00200
Filed: January 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Referring Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER dismissing Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint as moot. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot and that Defendant's #24 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. See attached Order for details. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/22/2020. (lctnm1)
May 22, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE re #37 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Response to Suggestion of Mootness filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION. (Bartos, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendant-Intervenors' Notice due by 5/22/2020. (hmc)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant-Intervenors' #37 Notice of Suggestion of Mootness by no later than May 22, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/15/2020. (lctnm1)
May 15, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS by BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brendan M. Branon Regarding Mootness, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Munro, Donald)
May 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Motion Hearing held on 5/8/2020 re #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #24 Motion to Dismiss. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #35 Response to Order of the Court, #34 Response to Document Plaintiffs' Response Regarding Scope and Nature of Remedies Requested filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NMB Letter re Procedural Neutral)(Bartos, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #35 Response to Order of the Court; emailed to amarkel@jonesday.com, cc'd 8 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Next time attorney signature must match login/password. (zeg, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Regarding Plaintiffs' Requests for Relief filed by BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Markel, Aaron)
May 4, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Re Remedy filed by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD. (Burch, Alan) Modified event on 5/7/2020 (znmw).
May 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors' additional briefing due by 5/4/2020. Plaintiffs' response due by 5/6/2020. (hmc)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors shall file any additional briefing regarding the appropriate scope and nature of the remedies requested in Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint on or before May 4, 2020. Plaintiffs shall file any response on or before May 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/30/2020. (lctnm1)
April 24, 2020 Filing 33 JOINT MEMORANDUM re Minute Order on 4/10/2020 by BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Markel, Aaron) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (zed, ).
April 13, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
April 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' memoranda due by 4/24/2020. (hmc)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the Defendant's #24 Motion to Dismiss on May 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The hearing will take place by telephone. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. The Court is considering advancing to a trial on the merits and consolidating it with this hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 65(a)(2). The parties are ORDERED to file on or before April 24, 2020, memoranda explaining their positions on whether advancing to a trial on the merits is appropriate at this time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/10/2020. (lctnm1)
April 6, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD. (Burch, Alan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 31 AMICUS BRIEF re Order on Motion for Leave to File, by AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINSMEN DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM. (Krieger, Kathy) Modified event title on 4/7/2020 (znmw).
March 30, 2020 Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY), SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS), SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF) . (Bartos, Jeffrey); Modified text to add filers at the request of counsel on 4/2/2020 (ztth).
March 30, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY), SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS), SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF) . (Bartos, Jeffrey) Modified text to add filers at the request of counsel on 4/2/2020 (ztth).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #28 Stipulation of Partial Dismissal, Defendant-Intervenors Grand Trunk Western Railroad Co. and Illinois Central Railroad Co. are hereby dismissed from this action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/25/2020. (lctnm1)
March 25, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Partial) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) as to Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company and Illinois Central Railroad Company by BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD CO., ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD CO., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Markel, Aaron)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #26 Consent Motion for Excusal from Local Rule 7(n). It is ORDERED that Defendant is excused from the requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(n). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/24/2020. (lctnm1)
March 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. Munro on behalf of BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD CO., ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD CO., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Munro, Donald)
March 23, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #23 Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to amarkel@jonesday.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Attorney Munro must file a proper notice of appearance. (zeg, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Order Excusing Defendant from Local Civil Rule 7(n) by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD (Burch, Alan)
March 23, 2020 Filing 25 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD. (Burch, Alan)
March 23, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD (Burch, Alan)
March 23, 2020 Filing 23 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD CO., ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD CO., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brendan M. Branon in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #14 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #15 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #16 Exhibit O to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #17 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #18 Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon, #19 Exhibit R to the Declaration of Brendan M. Branon)(Markel, Aaron)
March 16, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD CO., ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD CO., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY.(eg)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Participate in Briefing as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs. Amici shall file briefs on the same timeline as Plaintiffs and shall coordinate with Plaintiffs to avoid duplicating arguments. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/16/2020. (lctnm1)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of BNSF Railway Co., The Kansas City Southern Railway Co., CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Co., Norfolk Southern Railway Co., Illinois Central Railroad Co., Union Pacific Railroad Co., and The Belt Railway Co. of Chicago's (collectively the Railroads) #17 Unopposed Motion to Intervene, the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the Railroads be permitted to intervene as defendants as of right pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a). The Railroads' attached answer to the complaint shall be docketed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/16/2020. (lctnm1)
March 13, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINSMEN DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krieger, Kathy)
March 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 3/23/2020. (hmc)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Preliminary Injunction. Defendant shall now respond on or before March 23, 2020. The Court advises Defendant that further requests for an extension of time for this response will be disfavored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/12/2020. (lctnm1)
March 10, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD (Burch, Alan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 19 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY, ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Markel, Aaron)
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM re #17 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene filed by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY, GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY, ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Markel, Aaron)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Answer of the Movant-Intervenors, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Intervene)(Markel, Aaron)
March 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 3/16/2020. (hmc)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant shall now respond on or before March 16, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/4/2020. (lctnm1)
March 3, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD (Burch, Alan)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Proposed Order by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY), SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS), SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF) re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Bartos, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in support of re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY), SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS), SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeremy Ferguson, #2 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 1, #3 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 2, #4 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 3, #5 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 4, #6 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 5, #7 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 6, #8 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 7, #9 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 8, #10 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 9, #11 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 10, #12 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 11, #13 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 12, #14 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 13, #15 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 14, #16 Exhibit Ferguson Decl Exh 15, #17 Declaration Declaration of Thomas P Gholson, #18 Declaration Declaration of Jerry L Kalbfell, #19 Declaration Declaration of Joseph M LaPresa, #20 Declaration Declaration of Richard D Lee)(Bartos, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/5/2020 to correct docket event/text (eg).
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY), SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS), SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF) (Bartos, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/4/2020. (tg)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall now respond on or before May 4, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/26/2020. (lctnm1)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD (Burch, Alan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD (Burch, Alan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD served on 1/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grunert, John)
February 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using correct parties served. (eg)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/3/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grunert, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/03/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grunert, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grunert, John) Modified on 2/14/2020 (zeg).
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/28/2020. (lctnm1)
January 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY), SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS), SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF) (Grunert, John)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Grunert, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Grunert, John)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Bartos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bartos, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6766056) filed by SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY), SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP), INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS), SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS), SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF), SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT), SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP), SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons National Mediation Board, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney District of Columbia)(Grunert, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION et al v. NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-065 (BELT RY)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-393 (BNSF)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-887 (UP)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-680 (NS)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-513 (CSXT)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-569 (UP)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-201 (CSXT)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-851 (CSXT)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-898 (NS)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-225 (UP)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-457 (KCS)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-953 (UP)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-001 (BNSF)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-577 (UP)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-009 (BNSF)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-020 (BNSF)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-049 (CSXT)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-169 (NS)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-687 (NS)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-017 (BNSF)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-386 (BNSF)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-JTD (BNSF)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GCA GO-927 (UP)
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD CO.
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: GRAND TRUNK WESTERN RAILROAD CO.
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BELT RAILWAY COMPANY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINSMEN DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION
Represented By: Kathy L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?