PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP. et al v. CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. et al
Plaintiff: PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, COALSALES II, LLC, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC, PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES COMPANY, TWENTYMILE COAL COMPANY, PEABODY COALTRADE, INC and COALSALES, LLC
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY and CSX TRANSPORTATION INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00270
Filed: February 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Referring Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth T. Kidder on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (Kidder, Elisabeth)
March 10, 2020 Filing 29 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (Miller, Marc)
March 10, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda)
March 10, 2020 Filing 27 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
March 10, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by CSX TRANSPORTATION INC..(Miller, Marc)
March 10, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Eric Miller on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (Miller, Marc)
March 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
March 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
March 10, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO..(Collette, Matthew)
March 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Collette on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. (Collette, Matthew)
March 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Proposed Order by COALSALES II, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Stipulated Protective Order)(Gosselin, Sathya)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Case directly reassigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell pursuant to Order issued by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/20/2020. Judge Paul L. Friedman is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that this case shall be transferred to Chief Judge Howell's docket pursuant to Local Civil Rules 40.5(a) and 40.6(a). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 20, 2020. (MA)
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Francis DiSalvo on behalf of COALSALES II, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC (DiSalvo, Theodore)
February 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R. Gassman on behalf of COALSALES II, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC (Gassman, Seth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Hausfeld on behalf of COALSALES II, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC (Hausfeld, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Ratner on behalf of COALSALES II, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC (Ratner, Brian)
February 5, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda R Coolidge on behalf of COALSALES II, LLC, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC, TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC (Coolidge, Melinda)
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
February 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zrdj)
February 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 07-mc-489. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP. (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEABODY COALSALES, LLC (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COALSALES II, LLC (Gosselin, Sathya)
February 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6787701) filed by PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC, PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY, PEABODY COALSALES, LLC, PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC, PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION, COALSALES II, LLC, PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP., PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC, TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC, PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to BNSF Railway, #3 Summons as to CSX Transportation, #4 Summons as to Norfolk Southern, #5 Summons as to Union Pacific)(Gosselin, Sathya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP. et al v. CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION INC.
Represented By: Marc Eric Miller
Represented By: Elisabeth T. Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY COALSALES, LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COALSALES II, LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY POWDER RIVER MINING LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWENTYMILE COAL, LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY MIDWEST MINING LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY COALTRADE, LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY INVESTMENTS CORP.
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY COULTERVILLE MINING, LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY NATURAL RESOURCES COMPANY
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COALTRADE, LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY COALSALES COMPANY
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWENTYMILE COAL COMPANY
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEABODY COALTRADE, INC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COALSALES, LLC
Represented By: Sathya S. Gosselin
Represented By: Theodore Francis DiSalvo
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Melinda R Coolidge
Represented By: Brian A. Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?