K.O. et al v. SESSIONS, III et al
Plaintiff: C.J., F.C., L.J., E.O., JR., E.O. and K.O.
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, JOHN DOE CBP AGENTS, JOHN DOE ORR PERSONNEL, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, GENE HAMILTON, SCOTT LLOYD, RONALD D. VITIELLO, JOHN DOE ICE AGENTS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JOHN F KELLY, STEPHEN MILLER, THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Amicus Curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00309
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Prison Condition (Other)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER concerning status hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that the status hearing scheduled for April 7, 2020 shall be held by telephone as scheduled. The parties should not call chambers, but should follow the call-in instructions that the Court will communicate via email. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/3/2020. (lcrc2)
March 25, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Vicinanzo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicinanzo, David)
March 25, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Warecki on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Warecki, Nathan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Hampton Mason on behalf of ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, GENE HAMILTON, THOMAS HOMAN, JOHN F KELLY, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, STEPHEN MILLER, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, RONALD D. VITIELLO (Mason, Mary)
March 18, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Cacace on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cacace, Joseph)
March 18, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M Cooper on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cooper, Howard)
March 18, 2020 Filing 100 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Christopher Quast on behalf of ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, GENE HAMILTON, THOMAS HOMAN, JOHN F KELLY, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, STEPHEN MILLER, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, RONALD D. VITIELLO (Quast, Paul); Modified on 3/18/2020 (ztth).
March 18, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj)
March 18, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #100 Notice of Appearance; emailed to paul.c.quast@usdoj.gov, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: The Attorney Pacer login information and the signature on the pleading must match. Docket Entry #100 was entered in error. (ztth, ); Modified text on 3/19/2020 (ztth).
March 13, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph M. Cacace, Firm - Todd & Weld LLP, One Federal Street, 27th Floor, Boston, MA 02110. Telephone No. 617-720-2626 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6918904. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by C.J., E.O., E.O., JR., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittaker, Brian)
March 13, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Howard M. Cooper, Firm - Todd & Weld LLP, One Federal Street, 27th Floor, Boston, MA 02110. Telephone No. 617-720-2626 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6918816. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by C.J., E.O., E.O., JR., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittaker, Brian)
March 13, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren Maynard, Firm - Nixon Peabody LLP, Exchange Place, 53 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Telephone No. 617-345-1000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6918767. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by C.J., E.O., E.O., JR., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittaker, Brian)
March 13, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nathan P. Warecki, Firm - Nixon Peabody LLP, 900 Elm Street, 14th Floor, Manchester, NH 03101. Telephone No. 603-628-4000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6918506. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by C.J., E.O., E.O., JR., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittaker, Brian)
March 13, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David A. Vicinanzo, Firm - Nixon Peabody LLP, 900 Elm Street, 14th Floor, Manchester, NH 03101. Telephone No. - 603-628-4000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-6918230. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by C.J., E.O., E.O., JR., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittaker, Brian)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c), it is hereby ORDERED that David A. Vicinanzo is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2020. (lcrc2) Modified event title on 3/23/2020 (znmw).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #97 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c) it is hereby ORDERED that Lauren Maynard is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2020. (lcrc2) Modified event title on 3/23/2020 (znmw).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #99 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c) it is hereby ORDERED that Joseph M. Cacace is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2020. (lcrc2) Modified event title on 3/23/2020 (znmw).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #98 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c) it is hereby ORDERED that Howard M. Cooper is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case.Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2020. (lcrc2) Modified event title on 3/23/2020 (znmw).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #96 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c) it is hereby ORDERED that Nathan P. Warecki is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2020. (lcrc2) Modified event title on 3/23/2020 (znmw).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court by telephone for a status hearing on April 7, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Once all parties are on one line, they shall jointly call chambers at (202) 354-3520. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2020. (lcrc2)
February 28, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to C.J., E.O., E.O., JR., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Attorney Kenneth John Nichols terminated. (Nichols, Kenneth)
February 28, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian James Whittaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whittaker, Brian)
February 10, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objection by C.J., E.O., E.O., JR., F.C., K.O., L.J. re #90 Notice of Related Case, (Nichols, Kenneth)
February 10, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth John Nichols on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nichols, Kenneth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, GENE HAMILTON, THOMAS HOMAN, JOHN F KELLY, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, STEPHEN MILLER, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, RONALD D. VITIELLO. Case related to Case No. 18-2409. (Quast, Paul)
February 5, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Christopher Quast on behalf of ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, GENE HAMILTON, THOMAS HOMAN, JOHN F KELLY, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, STEPHEN MILLER, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, RONALD D. VITIELLO (Quast, Paul)
February 5, 2020 Filing 88 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 4:18-cv-40149. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 3, 2020 Filing 87 Case Electronically transferred to the District of Columbia. (Castles, Martin) Modified on 2/4/2020 (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 86 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting #51 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as the Court lacks personal jurisdiction over the Defendants and venue is improper in this District, denying #57 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery; denying #65 Motion to Strike; and granting #69 Motion for Leave to File reply. This case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 85 Response by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello to #84 Notice (Other) . (Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. Plaintiffs' Notice of Additional Relevant Facts and Evidence (Warecki, Nathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 83 Response by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello to #82 Notice of Supplemental Authorities . (Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 82 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #69 MOTION for Leave to File (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ms. J.P., et al. v. Sessions, et al., slip op., No. 2:18-cv-06081-JAK-SK (C.D. Cal. Nov. 5, 2019)(Demissie, Derege) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 81 Response by K.O. to #80 Notice of Supplemental Authorities, . (Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 80 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Mejia-Mejia Opinion, #2 Mejia-Mejia Order)(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 78 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 17, 2019, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 7/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 77 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2019 re #57 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery filed by L.J., E.O., K.O., E.O., Jr., #66 MOTION for leave from Compliance with Service Requirements in Local Rule 15.1 filed by F.C., E.O., C.J., E.O., Jr., #65 MOTION to Strike #60 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by F.C., E.O., C.J., E.O., Jr., #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Thomas Homan, Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, John F Kelly, Stephen Miller, Gene Hamilton, Ronald D Vitiello, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Scott Lloyd, #64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Ation Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by F.C., E.O., C.J., E.O., Jr., Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #51 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; taking under advisement #51 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #57 Motion for Discovery; taking under advisement #64 Motion for Leave to File Document ; taking under advisement #65 Motion to Strike ; taking under advisement #66 Motion for leave from Compliance with Service Requirements. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Cooper,Cacace,Warecki/Mason,Ward,Quast,Sady) (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 76 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Ward on behalf of Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello (Ward, Thomas) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 74 Opposition re #66 MOTION for leave from Compliance with Service Requirements in Local Rule 15.1 , #64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Ation Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(MacWilliams, Phil) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 73 Opposition re #66 MOTION for leave from Compliance with Service Requirements in Local Rule 15.1 filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. (Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 72 Opposition re #64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Ation Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. (Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary H. Mason on behalf of Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello (Mason, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 70 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute in Support of Defendants and Dismissal. (Hajec, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 69 Opposition re #65 MOTION to Strike #60 Reply to Response to Motion, and Motion for Leave to File 46-Page Reply filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. (Quast, Paul) Modified on 5/22/2019 (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 68 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #65 MOTION to Strike #60 Reply to Response to Motion, , #64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Ation Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #57 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery, #66 MOTION for leave from Compliance with Service Requirements in Local Rule 15.1 : Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 67 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #55 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for leave from Compliance with Service Requirements in Local Rule 15.1 by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C..(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Strike #60 Reply to Response to Motion, by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C..(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Ation Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 63 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #54 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John M. Miano. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 62 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher J. Hajec. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 61 Opposition re #57 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. (Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 59 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #58 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #57 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery. Response due by 5/8/2019. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 58 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 8, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #57 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello.(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional Discovery by E.O., E.O., Jr., K.O., L.J..(Warecki, Nathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Leave to File Granted February 8, 2019) filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief)(Bennion, Bradly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of JOHN M. MIANO Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7617029 by Immigration Reform Law Institute.(Bennion, Bradly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of CHRISTOPHER J. HAJEC Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7616867 by Immigration Reform Law Institute.(Bennion, Bradly) (Main Document 53 replaced on 4/3/2019) (Burgos, Sandra). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. (Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 51 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 3/22/2019) by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello.(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 50 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #38 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and finding as moot #38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's have filed an amended complaint. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 49 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #47 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 48 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Extending until March 8, 2019, the time for Defendants to file their anticipated motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint; (2) extending until April 8, 2019, the time for Plaintiffs to file their opposition to the motion; and (3) permiting the Defendants to file a reply on May 8, 2019. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello.(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Set Briefing Schedule and Extend Deadlines by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello.(Quast, Paul) Modified on 2/8/2019 (Castles, Martin). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Amended Complaint)(Maynard, Lauren) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 44 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 43 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7498399 by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J..(Nimni, Oren) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 42 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David A. Vicinanzo. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David A. Vicinanzo Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7496808 by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David A. Vicinanzo in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Warecki, Nathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 40 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. (Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/22/2019) by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello.(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 37 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello.(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 36 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time and setting briefing schedule. Motions to dismiss due by 1/8/19, Oppositions due by 2/22/19, Reply due by 3/29/19. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Set Briefing Schedule and Consolidate and Extend Deadlines by Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello.(Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul C. Quast on behalf of Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello (Quast, Paul) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 33 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #32 Motion for scheduling conference. A scheduling conference will be scheduled after the defendants have filed their answers. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Hearing (Request for an Initial Scheduling Conference) by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J..(Cooper, Howard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kirstjen Nielsen served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed L. Francis Cissna served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion to proceed under pseudonyms; granting #11 Motion to proceed under pseudonyms ; granting #10 Motion for Protective Order; and granting #11 Motion for Protective Order. (Castles, Martin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: US Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Service on HHS)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. John F Kelly served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. Acknowledgement filed by E.O., Jr.; K.O.; F.C.; E.O. ; L.J. ; C.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Serv John F Kelly)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. Alex Azar served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Acknowledgement filed by E.O., Jr.; K.O.; F.C.; E.O. ; L.J. ; C.J.. (Cacace, Joseph) (Main Document 26 replaced on 10/11/2018) (Jones, Sherry). Modified on 10/11/2018 (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Serv on US DOJ)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III in his capacity as Attorney General of U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Service on Sessions as Ag of US)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: U.S. Office of Refugee Resettlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Service on US Office of Refugee Resettlement)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: Andrew E. Lelling, US Atty for District of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Service on Lelling)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Acknowledgement filed by E.O., Jr.; K.O.; F.C.; E.O. ; L.J. ; C.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Aff of Service on J B Sessions)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. Stephen Miller served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Acknowledgement filed by E.O., Jr.; K.O.; F.C.; E.O. ; L.J. ; C.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Aff of Service on S Miller)(Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren N. Nimni on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Nimni, Oren) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Scott Lloyd served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kevin K. McAleenan served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/11/2018) (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ronald D Vitiello served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas Homan served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/11/2018) (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gene Hamilton served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and For Protective Order filed by K.O.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Church, Susan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and For Protective Order filed by E.O., Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Church, Susan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and For Protective Order by E.O., Jr..(Church, Susan). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 9/10/2018 (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and For Protective Order by K.O..(Church, Susan). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 9/10/2018 (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Maynard on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Maynard, Lauren) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan P. Warecki on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Warecki, Nathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John Doe CBP Agents, John Doe ICE Agents, John Doe ORR Personnel, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B. Church on behalf of K.O. (Church, Susan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse M. Bless on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Bless, Jesse) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M. Cooper on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Cooper, Howard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Cacace on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Cacace, Joseph) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand (Class Action) against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7305438 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 to Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Attachment B to Civil Cover Sheet, #11 JS45 Category Sheet)(Cacace, Joseph) (Attachment 11 replaced on 9/6/2018) (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.O. et al v. SESSIONS, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CBP AGENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE ORR PERSONNEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENE HAMILTON
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LLOYD
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD D. VITIELLO
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE ICE AGENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F KELLY
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MILLER
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS HOMAN
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Paul Christopher Quast
Represented By: Mary Hampton Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.J.
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Represented By: Joseph Michael Cacace
Represented By: Brian James Whittaker
Represented By: Howard M Cooper
Represented By: Nathan Warecki
Represented By: Kenneth John Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.C.
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Represented By: Joseph Michael Cacace
Represented By: Brian James Whittaker
Represented By: Howard M Cooper
Represented By: Nathan Warecki
Represented By: Kenneth John Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.J.
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Represented By: Joseph Michael Cacace
Represented By: Brian James Whittaker
Represented By: Howard M Cooper
Represented By: Nathan Warecki
Represented By: Kenneth John Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O., JR.
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Represented By: Joseph Michael Cacace
Represented By: Brian James Whittaker
Represented By: Howard M Cooper
Represented By: Nathan Warecki
Represented By: Kenneth John Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O.
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Represented By: Joseph Michael Cacace
Represented By: Brian James Whittaker
Represented By: Howard M Cooper
Represented By: Nathan Warecki
Represented By: Kenneth John Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.O.
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Represented By: Joseph Michael Cacace
Represented By: Brian James Whittaker
Represented By: Howard M Cooper
Represented By: Nathan Warecki
Represented By: Kenneth John Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?