BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY v. J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: RONALD STONER, METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC and J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00450
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/8/2020. (dot)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received numerous filings from the parties. First, the Court has received Ronald Stoner's #13 Answer to the #1 Complaint filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company ("Bankers Standard"). Second, the Court has received Meticulous Metal Roofing by RJ Stoner Contracting, LLC's #14 Answer to the #1 Complaint filed by Bankers Standard. Third, the Court has received Stoner and Meticulous Metal Roofing by RJ Stoner Contracting, LLC's #15 Answer to the #10 Cross-Claim brought by J.A. Skillman Company, Inc. Fourth, the Court has received Stoner and Meticulous Metal Roofing by RJ Stoner, LLC's #16 Cross-Claim Against Co-Defendant, J.A. Skillman Company, Inc. Lastly, the Court has received J.A. Skillman Company, Inc.'s #17 Answer to Stoner and Meticulous Metal Roofing by RJ Stoner, LLC's #16 Cross-Claim. Based on these filings, the Court understands that Answers have now been filed for the Complaint and Cross-Claims in this case. In light of the current COVID-19 pandemic and Standing Orders No. 20-9, 20-17, and 20-19, available on the District Courts website at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/coronavirus-covid-19-response-information-and-announcements, the Court shall hold off on scheduling an Initial Scheduling Conference. Instead, the Court will require the parties to prepare a joint statement in accordance with Local Rule 16.3(c) by no later than MAY 8, 2020. Upon review of the joint statement, the Court will determine if an initial scheduling conference or teleconference will be necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 16, 2020. (lccck1)
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Crossclaim #16 by J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC..(Peoples, Charles)
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC (Krause, Robert)
April 14, 2020 Filing 16 CROSSCLAIM against J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC. filed by RONALD STONER, METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC.(Krause, Robert)
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Crossclaim #10 by METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC, RONALD STONER.(Krause, Robert)
April 14, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC.(Krause, Robert)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by RONALD STONER.(Krause, Robert)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice with respect to Kathryn E. Bonorchis. The Motion contains the information required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d) and also specifies that counsel is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Accordingly, the Motion is GRANTED.Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for inst ructions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 14, 2020. (lccck1)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathryn E. Bonorchis, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7011081. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC, RONALD STONER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krause, Robert)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received #10 Defendant J.A. Skillman Company, Inc.'s Cross Claim Against Co-Defendants, which is brought against co-defendants Meticulous Metal Roofing by RJ Stoner Contracting, LLC and Ronald Stoner. Accordingly, Meticulous Metal Roofing by RJ Stoner Contracting, LLC and Ronald Stoner shall respond to the Cross-Complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 11, 2020. (lccck1)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC. (Peoples, Charles)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 CROSSCLAIM against METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC, RONALD STONER by J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC..(Peoples, Charles) Modified event on 3/10/2020 (znmw).
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC..(Peoples, Charles)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Peoples on behalf of J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC. (Peoples, Charles)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/18/2020. (Konzelmann, Christopher)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. RONALD STONER waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/18/2020. (Konzelmann, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Konzelmann, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/24/20. (DM)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC., METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC, RONALD STONER. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
February 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zrdj)
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Konzelmann, Christopher)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6835574) filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Konzelmann, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY v. J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Konzelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD STONER
Represented By: Robert Scott Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METICULOUS METAL ROOFING BY RJ STONER CONTRACTING, LLC
Represented By: Robert Scott Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. SKILLMAN COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Charles B. Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?