GAME PLAN,INC. v. NIKE INC. et al
Plaintiff: GAME, INC. PLAN and GAME PLAN, INC.
Defendant: UNINTERRUPTED, LLC, TAKE-TWO INTERACTIVE SOFTWARE, INC., WALT DISNEY COMPANY, NIKE INC., UNINTERRUPTED LLC, TAKE-TWOIN TERACTIVE SOFTWARE, INC and WALT DISNEY COMPANY doing business as ESPN, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00455
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TAKE-TWOIN TERACTIVE SOFTWARE, INC served on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/15/2020 (Jones, Ryan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNINTERRUPTED LLC served on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/15/2020 (Jones, Ryan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WALT DISNEY COMPANY served on 2/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020 (Jones, Ryan)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, the defendants shall answer the #1 Complaint on or before May 15, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 12, 2020. (lcdlf3)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NIKE INC. served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020 (Jones, Ryan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer 1:20-cv-00455 by GAME PLAN, INC. (Jones, Ryan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 28, 2020. (lcdlf3)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NIKE INC., UNINTERRUPTED, LLC, WALT DISNEY COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
February 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE 1:20-cv-00455 filed by Game Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons NIKE INC, #2 Summons ESPN INC, #3 Summons TAKE-TWO)(Jones, Ryan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET 1:20-cv-00455 by Game Plan, Inc. filed by Game Plan, Inc..(Jones, Ryan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1:20-cv-00455 against All Defendants with Jury Demand $33,000,000 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6838505) filed by Game Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Jones, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAME PLAN,INC. v. NIKE INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNINTERRUPTED, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKE-TWO INTERACTIVE SOFTWARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALT DISNEY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNINTERRUPTED LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAKE-TWOIN TERACTIVE SOFTWARE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALT DISNEY COMPANY doing business as ESPN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAME, INC. PLAN
Represented By: Ryan Laurence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAME PLAN, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Laurence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?