ARTHUR G. JAMES CANCER HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR II
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, THE PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, ARTHUR G. JAMES CANCER HOSPITAL, MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF BETHLEHEM, PENNSYLVANIA, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL & HEALTH CENTER, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF BETHLEHEM, PENNSYLVANIA doing business as ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA doing business as HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER and HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00460
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ALEX M. AZAR, II re #12 MOTION to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion for Consolidation (Craigmyle, Bradley)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion for Consolidation by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Motion to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion for Consolidation)(Craigmyle, Bradley) Modified on 4/17/2020 (zjf).
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Extension of Time to Respond to Plainitffs' Complaint)(Craigmyle, Bradley)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #11 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and DIRECTING defendant to file, by May 25, 2020, any response to plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 17, 2020. (lcbah2)
April 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/25/2020. (tg)
April 17, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #12 MOTION to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion for Consolidation was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled in the correct case.(jf)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Consolidation by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Motion for Consolidation)(Craigmyle, Bradley)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Thomas Craigmyle on behalf of All Defendants (Craigmyle, Bradley)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/24/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2020. (Holloway, James)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/24/2020. (Holloway, James)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR II served on 2/21/2020 (Holloway, James)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Holloway on behalf of ARTHUR G. JAMES CANCER HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL & HEALTH CENTER, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF BETHLEHEM, PENNSYLVANIA, STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA (Holloway, James)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 20, 2020.(lcbah2)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
February 19, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ARTHUR G. JAMES CANCER HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL & HEALTH CENTER, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF BETHLEHEM, PENNSYLVANIA, STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THE PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA (Goldsmith, Leslie)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6840063) filed by STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF BETHLEHEM, PENNSYLVANIA, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, THE PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM, OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, ARTHUR G. JAMES CANCER HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL & HEALTH CENTER, TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons as to Alex M. Azar, II, in his official capacity as Secretary, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services, #5 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General, #6 Summons as to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Goldsmith, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARTHUR G. JAMES CANCER HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRONG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR G. JAMES CANCER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAIMONIDES MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF BETHLEHEM, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL & HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF BETHLEHEM, PENNSYLVANIA doing business as ST. LUKE'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA doing business as HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as PENNSYLVANIA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as PENN PRESBYTERIAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Leslie Demaree Goldsmith
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: James P. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?