LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC, LANSING TRADE GROUP, LLC., LANSING-LOUISIANA, LLC, LANSING GRAIN CO., ANDERSON, INC., THE, LANSING VERMONT, INC. and ANDERSON, INC.
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY and CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00522
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Esteban Martin Estrada on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Estrada, Esteban)
April 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Conley on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Conley, Anne)
April 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacobus P. van der Ven on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (van der Ven, Jacobus)
April 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Joseph Horwich on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Horwich, Benjamin)
April 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Olasa, Kuruvilla)
April 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn D. Pomerantz on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Pomerantz, Glenn)
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 27, 2020. (lcbah3)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #15 Motion for the Approval and Entry of a Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 27, 2020. (lcbah3)
March 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Protective Order by ANDERSON, INC., LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC, LANSING GRAIN CO., LANSING TRADE GROUP, LLC., LANSING VERMONT, INC., LANSING-LOUISIANA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(May, Kirk)
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Helms on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Helms, David)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020 (May, Kirk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ANDERSON, INC., LANSING GRAIN CO., LANSING TRADE GROUP, LLC., LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC, LANSING VERMONT, INC., LANSING-LOUISIANA, LLC.(May, Kirk)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ANDERSON, INC., LANSING GRAIN CO., LANSING TRADE GROUP, LLC., LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC, LANSING VERMONT, INC., LANSING-LOUISIANA, LLC.(May, Kirk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ANDERSON, INC., THE, LANSING GRAIN CO., LANSING TRADE GROUP, LLC., LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC, LANSING VERMONT, INC., LANSING-LOUISIANA, LLC. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY waiver sent on 2/18/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(May, Kirk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANDERSON, INC., THE, LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC, LANSING GRAIN CO., LANSING TRADE GROUP, LLC., LANSING VERMONT, INC., LANSING-LOUISIANA, LLC (May, Kirk)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:20-cv-02046. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred District Court for the District of Columbia (MDL 2925). ***Terminating Case. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/24/2020. (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 2/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anderson, Inc., The, Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC. CSX Transportation, Inc. waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (May, Kirk) [Transferred from Kansas on 2/24/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anderson, Inc., The, Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC. BNSF Railway Company waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (May, Kirk) [Transferred from Kansas on 2/24/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Anderson, Inc., The, Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (May, Kirk) [Transferred from Kansas on 2/24/2020.]
February 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 2/24/2020.]
February 3, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 2/24/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC, The Andersons, Inc.. (May, Kirk) [Transferred from Kansas on 2/24/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5047881.), filed by The Andersons, Inc., Lansing Grain Co., Lansing Trade Group, LLC., Lansing Ethanol Services, LLC, Lansing Vermont, Inc., Lansing-Louisiana, LLC.(May, Kirk) [Transferred from Kansas on 2/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANSING ETHANOL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANSING TRADE GROUP, LLC.
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANSING-LOUISIANA, LLC
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANSING GRAIN CO.
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDERSON, INC., THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANSING VERMONT, INC.
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDERSON, INC.
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: David B. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?