STROSS v. RLAH LLC
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER STROSS
Defendant: RLAH LLC, FERNANDO GARCIA, WILLIAM O'BRYAN and RLAH LLC doing business as METRONANDO.COM
Case Number: 1:2020cv00648
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Cowley on behalf of ALEXANDER STROSS (Cowley, Steven)
April 16, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to WILLIAM O'BRYAN (Dorner, Drew) (Main Document 15 replaced on 4/17/2020) (ztd). Modified on 4/20/2020 (ztd).
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to FERNANDO GARCIA (Dorner, Drew) (Main Document 14 replaced on 4/17/2020) (ztd). Modified on 4/20/2020 (ztd).
April 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Amended Complaint due by 5/8/2020 (lsj)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby construes #13 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond as a Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and GRANTS it. Defendant shall respond to #8 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by May 8, 2020. In the future, the Court will not accept extensions by stipulation; the parties shall request extensions by motion stating good cause. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/16/20. (lccrc2)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #8 Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint to and including May 8, 2020 by RLAH LLC. (Lichtenstein, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's April 7, 2020 Order granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Order, it is hereby ORDERED that #11 Plaintiff's Alternative Motion for Discovery is DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED that #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Steven M. Cowley is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for inst ructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/14/20. (lccrc2)
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven M. Cowley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7019937. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALEXANDER STROSS (Attachments: #1 Declaration Steven M. Cowley, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorner, Drew)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice as moot #7 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Order. Because Plaintiff filed his amended complaint within 21 days of #5 Defendant's Answer, #8 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is hereby deemed the operative complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) (allowing plaintiffs to amend their complaints as of right within 21 days of service of a responsive pleading). The Court therefore DENIES AS MOOT #7 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment addressing Plaintiff's original complaint. Defendant shall file its answer to #8 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by April 15, 2020. The Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for May 6, 2020 is VACATED. Meanwhile, the Court encourages the parties to confer regarding an alternative resolution of the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/7/20. (lccrc2)
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEXANDER STROSS. (Dorner, Drew) Modified on 4/8/2020 (ztd).
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment Addressing the Original Complaint as Moot by ALEXANDER STROSS (Attachments: #1 Declaration Drew Dorner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration Steven Cowley, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorner, Drew)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically for Amended Complaint as to FERNANDO GARCIA, WILLIAM O'BRYAN. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ztd) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/2/2020) (ztd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/2/2020) (ztd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/3/2020) (zjf).
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RLAH LLC, FERNANDO GARCIA, WILLIAM O'BRYAN with Jury Demand filed by ALEXANDER STROSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons Garcia, #5 Summons O'Bryan)(Dorner, Drew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by RLAH LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichtenstein, Michael)
March 20, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for May 6, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/19/20. (lccrc2)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by RLAH LLC.(Lichtenstein, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RLAH LLC served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020 (Dorner, Drew)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to RLAH LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Dorner, Drew)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RLAH LLC D/B/A METRONANDO.COM with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6892081) filed by ALEXANDER STROSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Dorner, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STROSS v. RLAH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER STROSS
Represented By: Drew T. Dorner
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLAH LLC
Represented By: Michael Joshua Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERNANDO GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM O'BRYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLAH LLC doing business as METRONANDO.COM
Represented By: Michael Joshua Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?