PATTERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Defendant: ASHLEY MOODY, CARLOS GIMENEZ, WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC., JEFFREY ATKINS, KEVIN M. MOORE, LA'TIARA B. CALLOWAY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STEPHANIE MURPHY, CARLOS J. MARTINEZ, TERESA MARY POOLER, DANIEL JUNIOR, ELIZABETH WARREN, BERTILA SOTO, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, ALBERTO MILIAN, STEVEN D. MERRYDAY, KATHLEEN M. WILLIAMS, SCOTT S. HARRIS, JOHN G. ROBERTS, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, CECELIA M. ALTONAGA, JESSICA J. LYUBLANOVITS, JOHN A. TOMASINO, CHAD POPPELL, NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST, FRANK SCHWARTZ, MARK E. WALKER, SHAMIEKA CAROLINA JOY DONAWA, JOSE E. MARTINEZ, SAMI W. MNAYMNEH, CARLOS E. MENDOZA, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, WILLIAM P. BARR, RONALD D. DESANTIS and DONALD J. TRUMP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00686
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DIMITRI PATTERSON "Leave to file GRANTED" Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 4/20/2020(zrdj)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) STRIKING plaintiff's #1 Complaint and #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, owing to irregularities in the filing of those documents. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 provides that "[e]very pleading, written motion, and other paper must be signed by at least one attorney of record in the attorney's nameor by a party personally if the party is unrepresented." Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a) (emphasis added). Plaintiff is unrepresented but the documents were not signed by him personally. They were instead signed by an unknown person claiming to do so "on [his] behalf." See Compl. at 185; Certification for Mot. for Prelim. Inj. at 1, ECF No. 2-1. Absent a complaint, there is no case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 3 ("A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the court.") The Clerk of the Court is thus DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 10, 2020. (lcbah4)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 3/10/2020.....Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DIMITRI PATTERSON (Attachments: #1 65.1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) Modified on 3/10/2020 (zrdj).
March 9, 2020 SUMMONS (33) Issued as to JEFFREY ATKINS, WILLIAM P. BARR, LA'TIARA B. CALLOWAY, RONALD D. DESANTIS, SHAMIEKA CAROLINA JOY DONAWA, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, CARLOS GIMENEZ, SCOTT S. HARRIS, DANIEL JUNIOR, JESSICA J. LYUBLANOVITS, JOSE E. MARTINEZ, CARLOS E. MENDOZA, STEVEN D. MERRYDAY, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, ALBERTO MILIAN, SAMI W. MNAYMNEH, ASHLEY MOODY, KEVIN M. MOORE, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST, DIMITRI PATTERSON, TERESA MARY POOLER, CHAD POPPELL, JOHN G. ROBERTS, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, FRANK SCHWARTZ, BERTILA SOTO, JOHN A. TOMASINO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MARK E. WALKER, ELIZABETH WARREN, WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC., KATHLEEN M. WILLIAMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 3/10/2020.....COMPLAINT against CECELIA M. ALTONAGA, JEFFREY ATKINS, WILLIAM P. BARR, LA'TIARA B. CALLOWAY, RONALD D. DESANTIS, SHAMIEKA CAROLINA JOY DONAWA, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, CARLOS GIMENEZ, SCOTT S. HARRIS, DANIEL JUNIOR, JESSICA J. LYUBLANOVITS, CARLOS J. MARTINEZ, JOSE E. MARTINEZ, CARLOS E. MENDOZA, STEVEN D. MERRYDAY, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, ALBERTO MILIAN, SAMI W. MNAYMNEH, ASHLEY MOODY, KEVIN M. MOORE, STEPHANIE MURPHY, NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST, TERESA MARY POOLER, CHAD POPPELL, JOHN G. ROBERTS, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, FRANK SCHWARTZ, BERTILA SOTO, JOHN A. TOMASINO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MARK E. WALKER, ELIZABETH WARREN, WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC., KATHLEEN M. WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616102615) with Jury Demand filed by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) Modified on 3/10/2020 (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS GIMENEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN M. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA'TIARA B. CALLOWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS J. MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA MARY POOLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL JUNIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERTILA SOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTO MILIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN D. MERRYDAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN M. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT S. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN G. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECELIA M. ALTONAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA J. LYUBLANOVITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. TOMASINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD POPPELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK E. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAMIEKA CAROLINA JOY DONAWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE E. MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMI W. MNAYMNEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS E. MENDOZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD D. DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?