ADVANCED SPECIALTY CONTRACTORS v. CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ADVANCED SPECIALTY CONTRACTORS
Defendant: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00767
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Meet and Confer Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 10:15 AM before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 by 5/27/2020. Any dates contained in the Report should be expressed as specific dates (month/day/year) rather than as time frames (e.g. "60 days from the entry of the scheduling order"). The parties are directed to contact the Court's Deputy Clerk in the first instance to request the rescheduling of the Telephone Scheduling Conference. The party seeking the change in schedule must first confer with counsel for all other parties and be prepared to provide the Deputy Clerk with proposed mutually agreeable dates. The Court's Deputy Clerk will provide the parties, by separate email, with the dial in telephone number and procedures to allow them access to the call. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/10/2020. (jth)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Mervis, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY (Mervis, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by May 8, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/6/2020. (lcabj2)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(Mervis, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADVANCED SPECIALTY CONTRACTORS (Robbins, Seth)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADVANCED SPECIALTY CONTRACTORS (Robbins, Seth)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020 (Robbins, Seth)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020 (Robbins, Seth)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Specialty Contractors ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6932826) filed by Advanced Specialty Contractors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Notice Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Continental, #6 Summons Liberty)(Robbins, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADVANCED SPECIALTY CONTRACTORS v. CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVANCED SPECIALTY CONTRACTORS
Represented By: Seth Adam Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?