UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY v. AZAR
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00778
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceedings in this case are STAYED until further order from the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within 90 days of issuance of a decision in American Hospital Association v. Azar, Nos. 19-5048, 19-5198 (D.C. Cir.). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/14/2020. (lcrc2)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY. Attorney Elizabeth N. Swayne terminated. (Swayne, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
March 20, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmc)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Swayne on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY (Swayne, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Polston on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY (Polston, Mark)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY. Case related to Case No. 19-03751. (Kenny, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY (Kenny, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6937794) filed by UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Kenny, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Represented By: Christopher P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Justin Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?