THAI v. TAC INTEGRATED SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Thai
Defendant: Frederick Barnes and TAC Integrated Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00797
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #4 Summons Returned Executed was entered in error and was refiled by the Clerk's Office. (eg)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FREDERICK BARNES served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020; TAC INTEGRATED SOLUTIONS, LLC served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020 (eg)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Barnes)(Greenberg, Gregg) Modified on 5/19/2020 (eg).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 24, 2020. (lcdlf2)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FREDERICK BARNES, TAC INTEGRATED SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
March 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6947390) filed by Michelle Thai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Greenberg, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THAI v. TAC INTEGRATED SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAC Integrated Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Thai
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?