PATTERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Defendant: ASHLEY MOODY, CARLOS GIMENEZ, WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC., JEFFREY ATKINS, KEVIN M. MOORE, LA'TIARA B. CALLOWAY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, CARLOS J. MARTINEZ, TERESA MARY POOLER, DANIEL JUNIOR, ELIZABETH WARREN, BERTILA SOTO, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, ALBERTO MILIAN, STEVEN D. MERRYDAY, KATHLEEN M. WILLIAMS, SCOTT S. HARRIS, JOHN G. ROBERTS, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, CECELIA M. ALTONAGA, JESSICA J. LYUBLANOVITS, JOHN A. TOMASINO, CHAD POPPELL, NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST, FRANK SCHWARTZ, STEPHEN MURPHY, MARK E. WALKER, SHAMIEKA CAROLINA JOY DONAWA, JOSE E. MARTINEZ, SAMI W. MNAYMNEH, CARLOS E. MENDOZA, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, WILLIAM P. BARR, RONALD D. DESANTIS and DONALD J. TRUMP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00803
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Referring Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #15 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to emeehan@groom.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please do not refile. In future, counsel should docket all parts of the document. (ztth, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST. (See Docket Entry #15 to view document. (ztth)
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss , 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST. (Meehan, Edward)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Proposed Order by DIMITRI PATTERSON re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (ztth)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment against WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC. by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (ztth)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (ztth)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (See Docket Entry #10 to view document) (ztth)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (ztth)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing. (ztth)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing. (ztth)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 Case directly reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton as there is an earlier related case. Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Case directly reassigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell as related. Judge Royce C. Lamberth is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-00686 (D.D.C.), Case No. 1:18-cv-20241 (S.D. Fla.), Case No. 1:18-cv-20821 (S.D. Fla.), Case No. 1:18-cv-20878 (S.D. Fla.). (Meehan, Edward)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST (Meehan, Edward)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Meehan, Edward)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DIMITRI PATTERSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jf)
March 24, 2020 Summons (33) Issued as to CECELIA M. ALTONAGA, JEFFREY ATKINS, WILLIAM P. BARR, LA'TIARA B. CALLOWAY, RONALD D. DESANTIS, SHAMIEKA CAROLINA JOY DONAWA, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, CARLOS GIMENEZ, SCOTT S. HARRIS, DANIEL JUNIOR, JESSICA J. LYUBLANOVITS, CARLOS J. MARTINEZ, JOSE E. MARTINEZ, CARLOS E. MENDOZA, STEVEN D. MERRYDAY, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, ALBERTO MILIAN, SAMI W. MNAYMNEH, ASHLEY MOODY, KEVIN M. MOORE, STEPHEN MURPHY, NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST, TERESA MARY POOLER, CHAD POPPELL, JOHN G. ROBERTS, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, FRANK SCHWARTZ, BERTILA SOTO, JOHN A. TOMASINO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MARK E. WALKER, ELIZABETH WARREN, WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC., KATHLEEN M. WILLIAMS. (zjf)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CECELIA M. ALTONAGA, JEFFREY ATKINS, WILLIAM P. BARR, LA'TIARA B. CALLOWAY, RONALD D. DESANTIS, SHAMIEKA CAROLINA JOY DONAWA, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, CARLOS GIMENEZ, SCOTT S. HARRIS, DANIEL JUNIOR, JESSICA J. LYUBLANOVITS, CARLOS J. MARTINEZ, JOSE E. MARTINEZ, CARLOS E. MENDOZA, STEVEN D. MERRYDAY, MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, ALBERTO MILIAN, SAMI W. MNAYMNEH, ASHLEY MOODY, KEVIN M. MOORE, STEPHEN MURPHY, NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST, TERESA MARY POOLER, CHAD POPPELL, JOHN G. ROBERTS, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, FRANK SCHWARTZ, BERTILA SOTO, JOHN A. TOMASINO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MARK E. WALKER, ELIZABETH WARREN, WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC., KATHLEEN M. WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616102771) with Jury Demand filed by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/2/2020) (zjf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS GIMENEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLPATH RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN M. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA'TIARA B. CALLOWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS J. MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA MARY POOLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL JUNIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERTILA SOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTO MILIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN D. MERRYDAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN M. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT S. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN G. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECELIA M. ALTONAGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA J. LYUBLANOVITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. TOMASINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD POPPELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL PLAYER SECOND CAREER SAVINGS PLAN MASTER TRUST
Represented By: Edward Joseph Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK E. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAMIEKA CAROLINA JOY DONAWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE E. MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMI W. MNAYMNEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS E. MENDOZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD D. DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?