MILLER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: TONIQUE LAURENT MILLER and HELENE TONIQUE WILLIAMS
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and MICHAEL J. MADIGAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv00807
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/30/2020. (zmc)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Memorandum & Opinion by TONIQUE LAURENT MILLER (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 the plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing this civil action. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/7/20. (ms)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/7/20. (ms)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TONIQUE LAURENT MILLER (adh, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TONIQUE LAURENT MILLER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by TONIQUE LAURENT MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (adh, )
March 23, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/23/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONIQUE LAURENT MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELENE TONIQUE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. MADIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?