COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-NORTH MISSISSIPPI, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DESOTO, ST. MARYS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, SAINT ALPHONSUS MEDICAL CENTER ONTARIO INC.HOLY ROSARY, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-HUNTINGDON, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HEALTH HACKLEY CAMPUS, SAINT ALPHONUS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARYS SACRED HEART HOSPITAL, INC, ST. MARYS HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER SIOUX CITY, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALBANY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, SAINT ALPHONSUS MEDICAL CENTER NAMPA, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, NEA BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH MERCY ANN ARBOR, ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER PLYMOUTH, MOUNT CARMEL WEST, MT. CARMEL NEW ALBANY SURGICAL HOSPITAL, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER NORTH IOWA, ST. JOSEPH MERCY CHELSEA, ST. JOSEPH MERCY OAKLAND HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL UNION COUNTY, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL BOONEVILLE, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, MOUNT CARMEL ST. ANNS HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-GOLDEN TRIANGLE, ST. PETERS HOSPITAL, SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL TIPTON, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL MEMPHIS, NAZARETH HOSPITAL, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER DUBUQUE, SUNNYVIEW REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, ST. MARY MERCY HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH MERCY HOSPITAL LIVINGSTON, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY FITZGERALD HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL UNION CITY, MERCY HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HOLY CROSS HOSPITAL, MACNEAL HOSPITAL, ST. MARYS HOSPITAL and MERCY MEDICAL CENTER CLINTON
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00853
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/9/2020 (lsj)
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/09/2020. (lcrcl3)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holland, Liam)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam Holland on behalf of All Defendants (Holland, Liam)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/10/2020. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/20/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/19/2020.) (Marcus, Kenneth) Modified on 5/3/2020 (jf).
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 4/10/2020 (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 1, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. re #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Ce'rtificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the "SERVICE OF PROCESS" event (zjf)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER re #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marcus, Kenneth) Modified on 5/1/2020 (zjf).
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER re #5 Certificate of Service . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marcus, Kenneth) Modified on 5/1/2020 (zjf).
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marcus, Kenneth) Modified on 5/1/2020 (zjf).
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
March 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 19-3215. (Marcus, Kenneth)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALBANY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL BOONEVILLE, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DESOTO, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL MEMPHIS, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL TIPTON, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL UNION CITY, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL UNION COUNTY, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-GOLDEN TRIANGLE, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-HUNTINGDON, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-NORTH MISSISSIPPI, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HOLY CROSS HOSPITAL, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, MACNEAL HOSPITAL, MERCY FITZGERALD HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH HACKLEY CAMPUS, MERCY HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER CLINTON, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER DUBUQUE, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER NORTH IOWA, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER SIOUX CITY, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNT CARMEL ST. ANNS HOSPITAL, MOUNT CARMEL WEST, MT. CARMEL NEW ALBANY SURGICAL HOSPITAL, NAZARETH HOSPITAL, NEA BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT ALPHONSUS MEDICAL CENTER NAMPA, SAINT ALPHONSUS MEDICAL CENTER ONTARIO INC.HOLY ROSARY, SAINT ALPHONUS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH MERCY ANN ARBOR, ST. JOSEPH MERCY CHELSEA, ST. JOSEPH MERCY HOSPITAL LIVINGSTON, ST. JOSEPH MERCY OAKLAND HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER PLYMOUTH, ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY MERCY HOSPITAL, ST. MARYS HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, ST. MARYS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, ST. MARYS HOSPITAL, ST. MARYS SACRED HEART HOSPITAL, INC, ST. PETERS HOSPITAL, SUNNYVIEW REHABILITATION HOSPITAL (Marcus, Kenneth)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6971314) filed by MERCY MEDICAL CENTER SIOUX CITY, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT ALPHONUS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-NORTH MISSISSIPPI, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL BOONEVILLE, COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER, HOLY CROSS HOSPITAL, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER DUBUQUE, ST. MARYS HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER PLYMOUTH, ST. JOSEPH MERCY CHELSEA, ST. MARYS SACRED HEART HOSPITAL, INC, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, MT. CARMEL NEW ALBANY SURGICAL HOSPITAL, MACNEAL HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL UNION COUNTY, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER CLINTON, ST. JOSEPH MERCY OAKLAND HOSPITAL, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNT CARMEL WEST, ALBANY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT ALPHONSUS MEDICAL CENTER NAMPA, SUNNYVIEW REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER NORTH IOWA, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL MEMPHIS, SAINT ALPHONSUS MEDICAL CENTER ONTARIO INC.HOLY ROSARY, ST. JOSEPH MERCY ANN ARBOR, ST. MARYS HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DESOTO, MERCY FITZGERALD HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL UNION CITY, ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, NEA BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MOUNT CARMEL ST. ANNS HOSPITAL, ST. JOSEPH MERCY HOSPITAL LIVINGSTON, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL TIPTON, NAZARETH HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-GOLDEN TRIANGLE, ST. MARY MERCY HOSPITAL, MERCY HEALTH HACKLEY CAMPUS, SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ST. PETERS HOSPITAL, ST. MARYS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-HUNTINGDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #5 Summons ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, #6 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-NORTH MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DESOTO
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARYS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT ALPHONSUS MEDICAL CENTER ONTARIO INC.HOLY ROSARY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-HUNTINGDON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HEALTH HACKLEY CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT ALPHONUS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARYS SACRED HEART HOSPITAL, INC
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARYS HEALTH CARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER SIOUX CITY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBANY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPHS HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT ALPHONSUS MEDICAL CENTER NAMPA
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVENANT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEA BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH MERCY ANN ARBOR
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER PLYMOUTH
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNT CARMEL WEST
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MT. CARMEL NEW ALBANY SURGICAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER NORTH IOWA
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH MERCY CHELSEA
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH MERCY OAKLAND HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOYOLA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL UNION COUNTY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL BOONEVILLE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNT CARMEL ST. ANNS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-GOLDEN TRIANGLE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. PETERS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL TIPTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL MEMPHIS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAZARETH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER DUBUQUE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNNYVIEW REHABILITATION HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY MERCY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH MERCY HOSPITAL LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY FITZGERALD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL UNION CITY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOTTLIEB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLY CROSS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MACNEAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. MARYS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER CLINTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?