YFE, INC. v. ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: YFE, INC.
Defendant: FAIRMONT INSURANCE BROKERS, LTD. and ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00854
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FAIRMONT INSURANCE BROKERS, LTD.. Attorney Talon Rayfield Hurst terminated. (Hurst, Talon)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Roche, Sean)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Christopher Henschel, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7163049. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Sean)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William D. Deveau, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7163028. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Sean)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Sean)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #8 Defendant Fairmont Insurance Brokers, Ltd.'s Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant Fairmont Insurance Brokers, Ltd. shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before June 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/15/2020. (lcrjl2)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/15/2020. (lcrjl2)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FAIRMONT INSURANCE BROKERS, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurst, Talon)
April 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #6 Defendant Fairmont Insurance Brokers, Ltd.'s Consent Motion or Extension of Time to File, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant Fairmont Insurance Brokers, Ltd. shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before May 18, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/26/2020. (lcrjl2)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Hannon on behalf of FAIRMONT INSURANCE BROKERS, LTD. (Hannon, J.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FAIRMONT INSURANCE BROKERS, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Talon)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Talon Rayfield Hurst on behalf of FAIRMONT INSURANCE BROKERS, LTD. (Hurst, Talon)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. YFE, INC. served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020 (Oster, Steven)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRMONT INSURANCE BROKERS, LTD.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA CORRECTED COMPLAINT by YFE, INC. #1 Complaint, filed by YFE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Oster, Steven)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6971357) filed by YFE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Oster, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YFE, INC. v. ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRMONT INSURANCE BROKERS, LTD.
Represented By: J. Michael Hannon
Represented By: Talon Rayfield Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Sean Patrick Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YFE, INC.
Represented By: Steven Michael Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?