COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: MCLAREN FLINT, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, MCLAREN OAKLAND, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, MCLAREN BAY REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING and KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2020cv00891
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 4/30/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/23/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/29/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2020.) (MacCarthy, Sara)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
April 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, MCLAREN BAY REGION, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, MCLAREN FLINT, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1519. (MacCarthy, Sara)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, MCLAREN BAY REGION, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, MCLAREN FLINT, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (MacCarthy, Sara)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to ALEX M. AZAR II, as to US Attorney General, and as to US Attorney for District of Columbia re #1 Complaint,, filed by MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN MACOMB, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MCLAREN BAY REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, MCLAREN FLINT, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, MCLAREN BAY REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, MCLAREN MACOMB, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN FLINT, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, MCLAREN OAKLAND, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS.(MacCarthy, Sara)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN MACOMB, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MCLAREN BAY REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, MCLAREN FLINT, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY re #1 Complaint,, filed by MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN MACOMB, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MCLAREN BAY REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, MCLAREN FLINT, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, MCLAREN BAY REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY, MCLAREN MACOMB, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN FLINT, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, MCLAREN OAKLAND, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS.(MacCarthy, Sara)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ALEX M. AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6983635) filed by MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN MACOMB, FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN, MCLAREN LAPEER REGION, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL, MCLAREN BAY REGION, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, MCLAREN FLINT, FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 EJR Determination - Case Nos. 15-2000GC et al., #2 Exhibit 2 EJR Determination - Case No. 15-1672G)(MacCarthy, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN FLINT
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN PORT HURON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN MACOMB
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN OAKLAND
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH OLYMPIA FIELDS CAMPUS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN LAPEER REGION
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN CENTRAL MICHIGAN
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN BAY REGION
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH MICHIGAN CITY
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN GREATER LANSING
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARMANOS CANCER INSTITUTE
Represented By: Sara Jean MacCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?