UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: VERCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and CAC-MOTIR JOINT VENTURE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00911
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: CAC-Motir's response to Plaintiffs' Complaint due by 6/9/2020. (hmc)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant CAC-Motir Joint Venture, LLC's #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. CAC-Motir shall now respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before June 9, 2020. Defendant is reminded to strictly comply with the Court's #4 Standing Order, including Paragraph 9, which requires all motions for extension to be filed at least four business days in advance of the deadline. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/26/2020. (lctnm1)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CAC-MOTIR JOINT VENTURE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Blake, Hanna)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(Blake, Hanna)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAC-MOTIR JOINT VENTURE, LLC served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/25/2020; NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/25/2020 (eg)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/7/2020. (lctnm1)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to CAC-MOTIR JOINT VENTURE, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
April 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VERCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Schrader, Paul)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6993484) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VERCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons For Defendant CAC-Motir Joint Venture, LLC, #3 Summons For Defendant North American Specialty Insurance Company)(Schrader, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Paul Michael Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Paul Michael Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Hanna Lee Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAC-MOTIR JOINT VENTURE, LLC
Represented By: Edward Victor Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?