MATOS RODRIGUEZ et al v. PAN AMERICAN HEALTH ORGANIZATION
Plaintiff: RUSSELA MARGARITA RIVERO SARABIA, RAMONA MATOS RODRIGUEZ, FIDEL CRUZ HERNANDEZ and TATIANA CARBALLO GOMEZ
Defendant: JOAQUIN MOLINA, DOES NO. 1-10, ALBERTO KLEIMAN and PAN AMERICAN HEALTH ORGANIZATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00928
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel J Dubbin on behalf of TATIANA CARBALLO GOMEZ, FIDEL CRUZ HERNANDEZ, RAMONA MATOS RODRIGUEZ, RUSSELA MARGARITA RIVERO SARABIA (Dubbin, Samuel)
May 12, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Limited Non-Opposition to Filing of Second Amended Complaint by PAN AMERICAN HEALTH ORGANIZATION (Carome, Patrick)
May 12, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Bowker on behalf of PAN AMERICAN HEALTH ORGANIZATION (Bowker, David)
May 12, 2020 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by RUSSELA MARGARITA RIVERO SARABIA, RAMONA MATOS RODRIGUEZ, FIDEL CRUZ HERNANDEZ, TATIANA CARBALLO GOMEZ.(Cuneo, Jonathan)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #49 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of SAMUEL DUBBIN. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/8/2020. (lcjeb2)
May 8, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel J. Dubbin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7105469. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TATIANA CARBALLO GOMEZ, FIDEL CRUZ HERNANDEZ, RAMONA MATOS RODRIGUEZ, RUSSELA MARGARITA RIVERO SARABIA (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Samuel J. Dubbin, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cuneo, Jonathan)
April 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Second Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2020. (znbn)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' #48 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that: 1) If Plaintiffs intend to file a second amended complaint, they shall provide a copy of it to PAHO on or before May 4, 2020; 2) If Plaintiffs do provide a proposed second amended complaint to PAHO, then within four days of receiving it, PAHO shall inform Plaintiffs whether PAHO consents to the filing of the proposed complaint; 3) If PAHO does consent, then within two business days of receiving PAHO's consent, Plaintiffs shall file the proposed second amended complaint; 4) If PAHO does not consent, then within two weeks of the date on which PAHO declines consent, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for leave to file the second amended complaint; 5) PAHO shall Answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint within 45 days of: (a) May 4, 2020, if Plaintiffs do not provide a proposed second amended complaint to PAHO by that date; (b) the date that a second amended complaint is filed, if one is filed; or (c) the denial of Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint, if such a motion is denied; 6) Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to any motion to dismiss within 45 days of the filing of that motion; 7) PAHO shall file its reply in support of any motion to dismiss within 25 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' opposition. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/21/2020. (lcjeb2)
April 20, 2020 Filing 48 Joint STATUS REPORT by PAN AMERICAN HEALTH ORGANIZATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carome, Patrick)
April 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/22/2020. (nbn)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Given that this case has just been transferred here, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint status report by April 22, 2020, setting forth their proposed next steps in the litigation. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/8/2020. (lcjeb2)
April 7, 2020 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-24995. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER sustaining #42 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court; and Ggranting #18 Motion to Change Venue to the US District of Columbia for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #42 Putative Defendant Pan American Health Organization's Objections to and Appeal from Magistrate Judge's Denial of Motion to Transfer this Action to the District of Columbia. The parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on Defendant's Appeal on July 18, 2019, at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #40 Order on Motion to Change Venue to District Court filed by Pan American Health Organization. (Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #40 Order on Motion to Change Venue to District Court filed by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia. Replies due by 6/27/2019. (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 42 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge #40 Order on Motion to Change Venue to District Court (Attachments: #1 Addendum)(Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #20 MOTION to confirm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/23/2019. (jsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #18 MOTION to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (jsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-81 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie Joy Lewis, 954-985-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2019. (apz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 38 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2019 re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Columbia filed by Pan American Health Organization, #20 MOTION to confirm that Pan American Health Organization need not file any substantive response to the amended complaint until thirty (30) days after the Court decides the pending motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District filed by Pan American Health Organization. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 39 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Samuel Johnathan Dubbin and Jonathan W. Cuneo appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs; Daniel S. Volchok appeared and William King Hill appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Matter taken under advisement. (Digital 11:00:45) (sl) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Daniel S. Volchok is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendant Pan American Health Organization for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Volchok at daniel.volchok@wilmerhale.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel S. Volchok. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11540451 by Pan American Health Organization. Responses due by 4/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #18 MOTION to Change Venue; #20 MOTION to confirm for 4/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/3/2019. (jsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #30 MOTION for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/3/2019. (jsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Cuneo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/2/2019. (jsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter Gil-Montllor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/2/2019. (jsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant Pan American Health Organization's Reply in Support of its "Protective Motion" Regarding Timing of its Response to the Amended Complaint, #20 MOTION to confirm that Pan American Health Organization need not file any substantive response to the amended complaint until thirty (30) days after the Court decides the pending motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY REGARDING TIMING MOTION filed by Pan American Health Organization. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant Pan American Health Organization's Reply in Support of its "Protective Motion" Regarding Timing of its Response to the Amended Complaint by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia. (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Columbia filed by Pan American Health Organization. (Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to confirm that Pan American Health Organization need not file any substantive response to the amended complaint until thirty (30) days after the Court decides the pending motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia filed by Pan American Health Organization. (Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to confirm that Pan American Health Organization need not file any substantive response to the amended complaint until thirty (30) days after the Court decides the pending motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District filed by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia. Replies due by 3/29/2019. (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Columbia filed by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia. Replies due by 3/29/2019. (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Peter Gil-Montllor. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11498184 by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan Cuneo. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11498157 by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' Responses to #18 MOTION to Change Venue and #20 MOTION to confirm are due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/7/2019. (jsa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 22 Clerks Notice to Filer re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Venue Motions re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Columbia, #20 MOTION to confirm that Pan Amer MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Columbia, #20 MOTION to confirm that Pan American Health Organization need not file any substantive response to the amended. Motion with One Relief Filed as Multiple Reliefs; ERROR - The Filer selected multiple relief events when only one was necessary. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Columbia, #20 MOTION to confirm that Pan American Health Organization need not file any substantive response to the amended complaint until thirty (30) days after the Court decides the pending motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District ( Responses due by 3/19/2019), by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia. (Dubbin, Samuel) Modified Text to Reflect One Relief on 3/5/2019 (ls). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to confirm that Pan American Health Organization need not file any substantive response to the amended complaint until thirty (30) days after the Court decides the pending motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia (DE 18) by Pan American Health Organization. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William King Hill on behalf of Pan American Health Organization (Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Columbia by Pan American Health Organization. Attorney Jorge David Guttman added to party Pan American Health Organization(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald Anderson)(Guttman, Jorge) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Alberto Kleiman. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Joaquin Molina. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Alberto Kleiman by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia re #9 Amended Complaint, filed by Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Joaquin Molina by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia re #9 Amended Complaint, filed by Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes per DE 12. (vjk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William King Hill on behalf of Pan American Health Organization (Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Patrick J. Carome is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendant for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Carome at patrick.carome@wilmerhale.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint For Violations of the Trafficking Victims Protection Act and Racketeering and Corrupt Influenced Organizations (RICO) Act against All Defendants, filed by Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez.(Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick J. Carome. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11264872 by Pan American Health Organization. Responses due by 1/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William King Hill on behalf of Pan American Health Organization. Attorney William King Hill added to party Pan American Health Organization(pty:dft). (Hill, William) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Rodriguez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia re #1 Complaint, Notice of Filing Correction to Complaint by Interlineation (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Fidel Cruz Rodriguez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez. Pan American Health Organization served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pan American Health Organization. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes) Modified filed date on 11/30/2018 (pes). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pan American Health Organization. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11200451, filed by Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Fidel Cruz Rodriguez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dubbin, Samuel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATOS RODRIGUEZ et al v. PAN AMERICAN HEALTH ORGANIZATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELA MARGARITA RIVERO SARABIA
Represented By: Jonathan Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Samuel J Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMONA MATOS RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Samuel J Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIDEL CRUZ HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Samuel J Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TATIANA CARBALLO GOMEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Watson Cuneo
Represented By: Samuel J Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAQUIN MOLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES NO. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTO KLEIMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAN AMERICAN HEALTH ORGANIZATION
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Carome
Represented By: Daniel S. Volchok
Represented By: David W. Bowker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?