NATIONAL COMMUNITY REINVESTMENT COALITION v. OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL COMMUNITY REINVESTMENT COALITION
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY and FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv00932
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/27/2020 (lsj)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #9 joint status report, the parties are ORDERED to file a further status report by July 27, 2020, describing the Government's progress on the agencies' respective searches and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/28/20. (lccrc1)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Filed Jointly with FDIC and Plaintiff by OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY. (Burch, Alan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY.(Burch, Alan)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/13/20. (lccrc1)
May 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/27/2020 (lsj)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION.(Faust, Sarah)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Faust on behalf of FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION (Faust, Sarah)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (Burch, Alan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/13/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION served on 4/13/2020; OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY served on 4/10/2020. (See Docket Entry #3 to view document). (znmw)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7000253) filed by NATIONAL COMMUNITY REINVESTMENT COALITION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Shah, Nitin)
April 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL COMMUNITY REINVESTMENT COALITION v. OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL COMMUNITY REINVESTMENT COALITION
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
Represented By: Alan Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Sarah E Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?