UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HENDERSON
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: LOUIS H HENDERSON and LOUIS H. HENDERSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv00943
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE. LOUIS H. HENDERSON waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Nash, Ann)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 10, 2020. (lcbah4)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to LOUIS H HENDERSON. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
April 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LOUIS H HENDERSON (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nash, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Ann E. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ann E. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS H HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS H. HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?