HOLLAND et al v. CONSOL ENERGY INC. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, CARLO TARLEY and JOSEPH R. RESCHINI
Defendant: CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION and CONSOL ENERGY INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01148
Filed: May 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Bates on behalf of CONSOL ENERGY INC. (Bates, Alexis)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Torres on behalf of CONSOL ENERGY INC. (Torres, Joseph)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael R. Shebelskie, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7215952. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Shebelskie, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dufek, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gregory B. Robertson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7215899. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory B. Robertson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dufek, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexis E. Bates, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7215275. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONSOL ENERGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexis E. Bates in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bracey, Kali)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph J. Torres, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7215241. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONSOL ENERGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph J. Torres in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bracey, Kali)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant CNX Resources Corporation's #21 #22 Unopposed Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Gregory B. Robertson and Michael R. Shebelskie are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant CNX Resources Corporation. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/10/20. (lctjk2)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant CONSOL Energy, Inc.'s #19 #20 Unopposed Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Joseph J. Torres and Alexis E. Bates are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant CONSOL Energy, Inc. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judg e Timothy J. Kelly on 6/10/20. (lctjk2)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael R. Shebelskie, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7210542. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Shebelskie, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dufek, Christopher)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gregory B. Robertson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7210444. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory B. Robertson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dufek, Christopher)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by CONSOL ENERGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bracey, Kali)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONSOL ENERGY INC. (Bracey, Kali)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kali N. Bracey on behalf of CONSOL ENERGY INC. (Bracey, Kali)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant CNX Resources Corporations #17 #18 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Neither of the supporting declarations includes "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline," as required by this Court's local rules. LCvR 83.2(d). Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/9/20. (lctjk2)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant CONSOL Energy Inc.'s #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant CONSOL Energy Inc. shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' #5 Amended Complaint by July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/9/20. (lctjk2)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION (Dufek, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dufek, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Dufek on behalf of CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION (Dufek, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant CNX Resources Corporation's #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant CNX Resources Corporation shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #5 Amended Complaint by July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/8/20. (lctjk2)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenda S. Finch on behalf of Glenda S. Finch (Finch, Glenda) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/28/2020) (ztth).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Robert Taylor on behalf of MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, JOSEPH R. RESCHINI, CARLO TARLEY (Taylor, Joshua)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Filiberto Agusti on behalf of MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, JOSEPH R. RESCHINI, CARLO TARLEY (Agusti, Filiberto)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Andrew Green on behalf of MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, JOSEPH R. RESCHINI, CARLO TARLEY (Green, Paul)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Mooney on behalf of MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, JOSEPH R. RESCHINI, CARLO TARLEY (Mooney, John)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION, CONSOL ENERGY INC. filed by MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, CARLO TARLEY, JOSEPH R. RESCHINI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bardes, Diana)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020; CONSOL ENERGY INC. served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020 (Bardes, Diana)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION, CONSOL ENERGY INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ERRATA by MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, JOSEPH R. RESCHINI, CARLO TARLEY. (Bardes, Diana)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )
May 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION, CONSOL ENERGY INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7083930) filed by MICHAEL H. HOLLAND, CARLO TARLEY, JOSEPH R. RESCHINI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bardes, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLAND et al v. CONSOL ENERGY INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNX RESOURCES CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher J. Dufek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOL ENERGY INC.
Represented By: Alexis Bates
Represented By: Kali N. Bracey
Represented By: Joseph Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL H. HOLLAND
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Paul Andrew Green
Represented By: John R Mooney
Represented By: Filiberto Agusti
Represented By: Joshua Robert Taylor
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLO TARLEY
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Paul Andrew Green
Represented By: John R Mooney
Represented By: Filiberto Agusti
Represented By: Joshua Robert Taylor
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH R. RESCHINI
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Paul Andrew Green
Represented By: John R Mooney
Represented By: Filiberto Agusti
Represented By: Joshua Robert Taylor
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?