G.J. MILLER CONTRACTING, LLC v. AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: G.J. MILLER CONTRACTING, LLC
Defendant: AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Intervenor Defendant: DESBUILD EG MANAGEMENT SERVICES JV, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01157
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020 (Webster, Lucas)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Leo Patin on behalf of DESBUILD EG MANAGEMENT SERVICES JV, LLC (Patin, Douglas)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by DESBUILD EG MANAGEMENT SERVICES JV, LLC.(ztd)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for October 5, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/8/20. (lccrc2)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion to Intervene. Desbuild Management Services JV, LLC's motion to intervene as of right under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a)(2) is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to add Desbuild Management Services JV, LLC as a Defendant. It is further ORDERED that, as of June 8, 2020, [7-1] Desbuild's proposed Answer shall be deemed filed in this Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/8/20. (lccrc2)
June 8, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DESBUILD EG MANAGEMENT SERVICES JV, LLC (Brown, Lee-Ann)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Intervene by DESBUILD EG MANAGEMENT SERVICES JV, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Desbuild's Answer to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Brown, Lee-Ann)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Mervis, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth K. Sorteberg on behalf of G.J. MILLER CONTRACTING, LLC (Sorteberg, Kenneth)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
May 5, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by G.J. MILLER CONTRACTING, LLC (Webster, Lucas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7087309) filed by G.J. MILLER CONTRACTING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons)(Webster, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.J. MILLER CONTRACTING, LLC v. AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.J. MILLER CONTRACTING, LLC
Represented By: Lucas Farinato Webster
Represented By: Kenneth K. Sorteberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DESBUILD EG MANAGEMENT SERVICES JV, LLC
Represented By: Lee-Ann C. Brown
Represented By: Douglas Leo Patin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?