NETTEL CORPORATION, INC. et al v. HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Appellant: WEBSTER & FREDRICKSON, PLLC and WENDELL W. WEBSTER
In Re: NETTEL COMMUNICATIONS, INC. and NETTEL CORPORATION, INC.
Appellee: ARTHUR P. LANDER, JOHN P. FITZGERALD, III and HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv01242
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:8001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, the parties' #6 Consent Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the appellants' brief is due by August 24, 2020; the appellees' briefs are due by September 24, 2020; and the appellants' reply is due by October 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/7/2020. (lctjk3)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule, MOTION for Briefing Schedule by JOHN P. FITZGERALD, III (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eustis, Kristen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Supplement Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Bankruptcy Court case number 00-01771-SMT.. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by WEBSTER & FREDRICKSON, PLLC, WENDELL W. WEBSTER.(zrdj)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Supplement to Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Bankruptcy Court case number 00-01771-SMT. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by WEBSTER & FREDRICKSON, PLLC, WENDELL W. WEBSTER. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 3, #2 Part 3 of 3)(zrdj)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #2 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability (zrdj)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Bankruptcy Court case number 00-01771-SMT. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by WEBSTER & FREDRICKSON, PLLC, WENDELL W. WEBSTER.(zrdj)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 00-1771-SMT. File received, filed by WEBSTER & FREDRICKSON, PLLC, WENDELL W. WEBSTER. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ztth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2020: #2 Exhibit) (ztth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NETTEL CORPORATION, INC. et al v. HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WEBSTER & FREDRICKSON, PLLC
Represented By: Natalie S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WENDELL W. WEBSTER
Represented By: Natalie S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: NETTEL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: NETTEL CORPORATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ARTHUR P. LANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN P. FITZGERALD, III
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Guzinski
Represented By: Kristen S. Eustis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Vivian Katsantonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?