SHEN v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: YIREN SHEN
Defendant: CHAD WOLF, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, CARL C. RISCH, SEAN STEIN, WILLIAM BARR, EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY and CHAD F. WOLF
Case Number: 1:2020cv01263
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 SURREPLY re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by YIREN SHEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(zjf)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket plaintiff's sur-reply [11-1] and the exhibits attached thereto [11-2] [11-3]. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/21/2020. (lcabj2)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by YIREN SHEN. (Attachments: #1 Surreply Brief, #2 Declaration of Yiren Shen, #3 CEAC Status Page, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Leave to File Surreply)(Ragland, Thomas) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct docket event/text (zjf).
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA (Clarification) by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI, CARL C. RISCH, SEAN STEIN, CHAD F. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY #9 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by MICHAEL R. POMPEO, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI, CHAD F. WOLF, SEAN STEIN, CARL C. RISCH, WILLIAM BARR. (Cirino, Paul)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI, CARL C. RISCH, SEAN STEIN, CHAD F. WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2/12/20 email to Plaintiff)(Cirino, Paul)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by YIREN SHEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Yiren Shen, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragland, Thomas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI, CARL C. RISCH, SEAN STEIN, CHAD WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Chloe Dybdahl, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by July 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/20/2020. (lcabj2)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI, CARL C. RISCH, SEAN STEIN, CHAD WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/22/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/21/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/20/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM BARR served on 5/22/2020; MICHAEL R. POMPEO served on 5/22/2020; EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI served on 5/22/2020; CARL C. RISCH served on 5/22/2020; SEAN STEIN served on 5/22/2020; CHAD WOLF served on 5/20/2020; CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 5/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service for William Barr, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service for Timothy Shea, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service for Sean Stein, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service for Michael R. Pompeo, #5 Exhibit Proof of Service for Edward J. Ramotowski, #6 Exhibit Proof of Service for Christopher Wray, #7 Exhibit Proof of Service for Chad Wolf, #8 Exhibit Proof of Service for Carl Risch)(Ragland, Thomas)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants (Cirino, Paul)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued (8) Electronically as to WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI, CARL C. RISCH, SEAN STEIN, CHAD WOLF, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA corrected civil cover sheet by YIREN SHEN. (Ragland, Thomas)
May 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7121292) filed by YIREN SHEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for the U.S. Attorney General, #3 Summons for the Secretary of State, #4 Summons for the Deputy Assistant Secretary for Visa Services, #5 Summons for the Assistant Secretary for the Bureau of Consular Affairs, #6 Summons for the Consul General, U.S. Consulate Shanghai, #7 Summons for the United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, #8 Summons for the Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, #9 Summons for the Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation)(Ragland, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEN v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YIREN SHEN
Represented By: Thomas K. Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL C. RISCH
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN STEIN
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD J. RAMATOWSKI
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?