DALY v. ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: ROBERT DALY
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv01406
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #4 Motion to Dismiss; emailed to jepak@nilesbarton.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect document/case, 2. DO NOT REFILE- For future filings correct the case number to 20cv1406 (zjf, )
July 9, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #5 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests; emailed to jepak@nilesbarton.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. DO NOT REFILE- For future filings correct the case number to 20cv1406. (ztth, ); Modified text on 7/13/2020 (ztth).
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George E. Reede, Jr on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY (Reede, George)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY (Pak, Jessica
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Jessica)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by ROBERT DALY #1 Complaint, filed by ROBERT DALY. (Attachments: #1 Revised Complaint (caption), #2 Revised Civil Cover Sheet)(Yoder, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ROBERT DALY against ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY with Jury Demand in excess of $5,000,000 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7166124) filed by ROBERT DALY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1)(Yoder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DALY v. ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DALY
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?