WHITE MOUNTAIN APACHE TRIBE v. SCALIA et al
Plaintiff: WHITE MOUNTAIN APACHE TRIBE
Defendant: EUGENE SCALIA, PRESTON RUTLEDGE and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01409
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of PRESTON RUTLEDGE, EUGENE SCALIA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Tepe, Sean)
July 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #9 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and refiled by Clerk's Office using the correct event/category. (zjf)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/8/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/7/2020. (zjf)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 6/10/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 7/1/2020. (Yoder, Robert) Modified on 7/5/2020 (zjf).
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/22/2020. (Yoder, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EUGENE SCALIA served on 6/22/2020 (Yoder, Robert).
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eirik Cheverud on behalf of All Defendants (Cheverud, Eirik)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Robert Brauchli is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/11/2020. (jag)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/11/2020. (jag)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to PRESTON RUTLEDGE, EUGENE SCALIA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
May 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Notice of Compliance with ERISA 502(h) by WHITE MOUNTAIN APACHE TRIBE re #1 Complaint, (Yoder, Robert)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert C. Brauchli, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7167002. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WHITE MOUNTAIN APACHE TRIBE (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit to Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice R. Brauchli)(Yoder, Robert)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7166919) filed by WHITE MOUNTAIN APACHE TRIBE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Preston Rutledge, #3 Summons Eugene Scalia, #4 Summons USA c/o William Barr, #5 Summons USA c/o US Atty Office DC)(Yoder, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE MOUNTAIN APACHE TRIBE v. SCALIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENE SCALIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESTON RUTLEDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITE MOUNTAIN APACHE TRIBE
Represented By: Robert Richard Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?