GOMEZ et al v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: MIRNA S., VICENTA S., DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, ASSE INTERNATIONAL, INC., ANGELA SINON, NANCY ABARCA, DANIEL CHIBUNDU NWANKWO, IWUNDU EPOUSE KOUADIO GOLDEN, POWERTRUNK, INC., EURAUPAIR INTERNATIONAL, INC., SHYAM SUNDAR KOIRALA, SEIU COMMITTEE OF INTERNS AND RESIDENTS, JUAN CARLOS ROSARIO LEBRON, FATMA BUSHATI, AYA NAKAMURA, CARMEN LIGIA VIDAL PIMENTEL, JODI LYNN KARPES, 3Q DIGITAL, CLAUDIO ALEJANDRO SARNI JIMENEZ, LOIDA PHELPS, M.S., NAZIF ALAM, SHIPCO TRANSPORT, INC., SUPERIOR SCAPE, INC., FARANGIS KURBONOVA and AJA TAMAMU MARIAMA KINTEH
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, MICHAEL POMPEO, CHAD WOLF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, WILLIAM BARR and DONALD J. TRUMP
Amicus Curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Case Number: 1:2020cv01419
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Farangis Kurbonova (Pincus, Andrew)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Plaintiffs Domingo Arreguin Gomez, Mirna S., and Vicenta S. and Advising Court that Plaintiff Mohamed Saleh, Identified as M.S., No Longer Seeks to Proceed Under Pseudonym (Pincus, Andrew)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jordan Cunnings is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/22/2020. (lcapm1)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jordan Cunnings, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7366438. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 3Q DIGITAL, NANCY ABARCA, NAZIF ALAM, ASSE INTERNATIONAL, INC., FATMA BUSHATI, EURAUPAIR INTERNATIONAL, INC., IWUNDU EPOUSE KOUADIO GOLDEN, DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, CLAUDIO ALEJANDRO SARNI JIMENEZ, JODI LYNN KARPES, AJA TAMAMU MARIAMA KINTEH, SHYAM SUNDAR KOIRALA, FARANGIS KURBONOVA, JUAN CARLOS ROSARIO LEBRON, M.S., AYA NAKAMURA, DANIEL CHIBUNDU NWANKWO, LOIDA PHELPS, CARMEN LIGIA VIDAL PIMENTEL, POWERTRUNK, INC., MIRNA S., VICENTA S., SEIU COMMITTEE OF INTERNS AND RESIDENTS, SHIPCO TRANSPORT, INC., ANGELA SINON, SUPERIOR SCAPE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Cunnings, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHAD WOLF filed by MIRNA S., DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, VICENTA S., 3Q DIGITAL, CARMEN LIGIA VIDAL PIMENTEL, IWUNDU EPOUSE KOUADIO IJEOMA GOLDEN, FARANGIS KURBONOVA, ASSE INTERNATIONAL, INC., CLAUDIO ALEJANDRO SARNIGUET JIMENEZ, SUPERIOR SCAPE, INC., NAZIF ALAM, SHIPCO TRANSPORT, INC., NANCY ABARCA, ANGELA SINON, POWERTRUNK, INC., M.S., EURAUPAIR INTERNATIONAL, INC., DANIEL CHIBUNDU NWANKWO, JODI LYNN KARPES, FATMA BUSHATI, AYA NAKAMURA, JUAN CARLOS ROSARIO LEBRON, LOIDA PHELPS, SEIU COMMITTEE OF INTERNS AND RESIDENTS, SHYAM SUNDAR KOIRALA, AJA TAMAMU MARIAMA KINTEH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Pincus, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 7/17/2020. Responsive Pleading due by 9/17/2020. (zjd)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint by July 17, 2020, and Defendants shall file their answer or motion by September 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/2/2020. (lcapm1).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S.. (Pincus, Andrew)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on June 18, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance: June 26, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purcha sed from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2020.(wz)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint STATUS REPORT by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S.. (Pincus, Andrew)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Laboni Hoq on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoq, Laboni)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 4:00 PM before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (zjd)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference reset to 6/24/2020 at 3:30 PM before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Telephone Conference held on 6/24/2020. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/25/2020 (zjd)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #21 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and denying Plaintiffs' #20 Motion for Class Certification. The parties shall provide the court with a joint status report by June 25, 2020, updating the court on the status of W.Z.A.'s visa application. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/23/2020. (lcapm1)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pincus, Andrew)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Thomas Lyerla on behalf of All Defendants (Lyerla, Christopher) (Main Document 39 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SURREPLY to re #20 MOTION to Certify Class , #21 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHAD WOLF. (York, Thomas)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2020 re #20 Motion to Certify Class and #21 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendants may, if they wish, file a surreply brief of no more than ten double-spaced pages (excluding exhibits) by 12:00 pm on June 18, 2020, which addresses Plaintiffs' contentions that (1) Vincenta S. has standing to sue, and (2) Plaintiffs' Class Claims are not moot. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/17/2020. (lcapm1)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to opposition to motion re #21 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. Blackford, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brian J. Blackford, #3 Declaration of Alondra Ramos Flores)(Pincus, Andrew)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to opposition to motion re #20 MOTION to Certify Class filed by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S.. (Dahab, Nadia)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMICUS BRIEF by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE. (eg)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Certify Class , #21 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Unopposed) by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants as Amicus Curiae. The Clerk is directed to file Immigration Reform Law Institute's brief submitted with the Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/15/2020. (lcapm1)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs' Reply Briefs due by 6/16/2020. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2020 at 2:00 PM via video conference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy shall circulate dial-in information to counsel. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (zjd)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #34 motion to extend the deadline to submit their reply briefs in further support of the pending motions. Plaintiffs' reply briefs shall be filed by June 16, 2020. The hearing on the pending motions is hereby rescheduled for June 18, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/15/2020. (lcapm1) Modified on 6/15/2020 (lczh).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants as Amicus Curiae by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Memo of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Memorandum in opposition re #20 MOTION to Certify Class filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHAD WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proclamation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Marwaha Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dus Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Second Dus Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Bent Declaration)(York, Thomas) Modified docket event/text on 6/15/2020 (eg).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadia H. Dahab on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dahab, Nadia)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to re #21 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHAD WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Proclamation 10014 (Federal Register), #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Marwaha Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Dus Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 Second Dus Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 Bent Declaration)(Wen, James)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wen on behalf of All Defendants (Wen, James)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Benton York on behalf of All Defendants (York, Thomas)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/5/2020. (Pincus, Andrew)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2020. (Pincus, Andrew)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference at 5:00 p.m. today, June 5, 2020. The dial-in credentials are the same. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/5/2020. (lcapm1)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2020. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Plaintiffs Mirna S. and Vicenta S. are permitted to proceed under pseudonyms and without providing their personal residential addresses. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/5/2020. (lcapm1).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 5:00 PM before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Telephone Conference held on 6/4/2020. Opposition with respect to specified plaintiffs due by 6/8/2020. Oppositions to Motions for TRO and Class Certification due by 6/12/2020. Replies due by 6/15/2020. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Tess Hellgren on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hellgren, Tess)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Manning on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Manning, Stephen)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William Chang on behalf of All Defendants (Chang, William)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference at 4:45 p.m. today, June 3, 2020. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information to counsel. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/3/2020. (lcapm1)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/3/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 5:30 PM before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and For Expedited Decision by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Attachments: #1 Local Civil Rule 65.1(a) Statement, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Charles Wheeler, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Stephen W. Manning, #4 Exhibit A to the Manning Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to the Manning Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to the Manning Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to the Manning Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to the Manning Declaration, #9 Exhibit C - Declaration of Mirna S., #10 Exhibit D - Declaration of Michael J. Eatroff, #11 Exhibit E - Declaration of M.T.S., #12 Exhibit A to the M.T.S. Declaration, #13 Exhibit B to the M.T.S. Declaration, #14 Exhibit F - Declaration of Domingo Arreguin Gomez, #15 Exhibit G - Declaration of Monica Tay Belej, #16 Exhibit H - Declaration of Vicenta S., #17 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Brian J. Blackford, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Certify Class by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bless, Jesse)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen C. Tumlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tumlin, Karen) (Main Document 19 replaced on 6/5/2020) (zeg).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Cleland B. Welton, II on behalf of DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Welton, Cleland)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Ingber on behalf of DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Ingber, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE Regarding Exhibits to Complaint by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pincus, Andrew)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther H. Sung on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sung, Esther) (Main Document 15 replaced on 6/5/2020) (zeg).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Laboni A. Hoq is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/2/2020. (lcapm1)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ERRATA re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laboni A. Hoq, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7181157. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Bless, Jesse) Modified docket event/text on 6/2/2020 (eg).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laboni A. Hoq, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7181157. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Bless, Jesse)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 , #12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Esther H. Sung and Karen C. Tumlin are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/1/2020. (lcapm1)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen C. Tumlin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7176416. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Bless, Jesse)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Esther H. Sung, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7176410. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Bless, Jesse)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cleland B. Welton II, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7176117. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cleland B. Welton II, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew D. Ingber, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7176101. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew D. Ingber, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tess Hellgren, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7175424. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Bless, Jesse)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen W. Manning, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7175415. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Bless, Jesse)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nadia H. Dahab, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7175389. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S. (Bless, Jesse)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nadia Halima Dahab is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/29/2020. (lcapm1)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew D. Ingber is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/29/2020. (lcapm1)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Cleland B. Welton II is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/29/2020. (lcapm1)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tess Hellgren is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/29/2020. (lcapm1)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stephen W. Manning is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/29/2020. (lcapm1)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Matthew Bless on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bless, Jesse)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ, MIRNA S., VICENTA S.. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-718. (Pincus, Andrew)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHAD WOLF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7171161) filed by VICENTA S., MIRNA S., DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Trump, #3 Summons Barr, #4 Summons Dept. of State, #5 Summons Pompeo, #6 Summons Dept. of Homeland Security, #7 Summons Wolf, #8 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Pincus, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOMEZ et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Represented By: James Wen
Represented By: William Chang
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Lyerla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL POMPEO
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Represented By: James Wen
Represented By: William Chang
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Lyerla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Represented By: James Wen
Represented By: William Chang
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Lyerla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Represented By: James Wen
Represented By: William Chang
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Lyerla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Represented By: James Wen
Represented By: William Chang
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Lyerla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Represented By: James Wen
Represented By: William Chang
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Lyerla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRNA S.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Bless
Represented By: Cleland B. Welton, II
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Laboni Hoq
Represented By: Matthew David Ingber
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICENTA S.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Bless
Represented By: Cleland B. Welton, II
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Laboni Hoq
Represented By: Matthew David Ingber
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINGO ARREGUIN GOMEZ
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Bless
Represented By: Cleland B. Welton, II
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Laboni Hoq
Represented By: Matthew David Ingber
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Represented By: Stephen Manning
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSE INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA SINON
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY ABARCA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL CHIBUNDU NWANKWO
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IWUNDU EPOUSE KOUADIO GOLDEN
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POWERTRUNK, INC.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EURAUPAIR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHYAM SUNDAR KOIRALA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIU COMMITTEE OF INTERNS AND RESIDENTS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN CARLOS ROSARIO LEBRON
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATMA BUSHATI
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AYA NAKAMURA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN LIGIA VIDAL PIMENTEL
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODI LYNN KARPES
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3Q DIGITAL
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIO ALEJANDRO SARNI JIMENEZ
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOIDA PHELPS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAZIF ALAM
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIPCO TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPERIOR SCAPE, INC.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARANGIS KURBONOVA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJA TAMAMU MARIAMA KINTEH
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Represented By: Lawrence J. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?