HELVETIA COAL COMPANY et al v. UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION
Plaintiff: CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY and ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY
Defendant: UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01476
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Cases Consolidated. Case 20-1476 have been consolidated with 20-1475 pursuant to Minute Orders entered 07/30/2020. ALL PLEADINGS MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-1475. THE PARTIES ARE ADVISED NOT TO ELECT TO SPREAD TEXT WHEN FILING IN ECF. (eg)
July 29, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #58 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading correct attorney entering appearance. Attorney signature must match login/password. (eg)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin F. Fagan, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Kevin F. Fagan is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 28, 2020. (lccjn2)
July 27, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin F. Fagan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7389749. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION (Stern, Deborah)
July 27, 2020 Filing 58 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Stern on behalf of All Defendants (Stern, Deborah) Modified on 7/29/2020 (eg).
July 24, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Stern on behalf of All Defendants (Stern, Deborah) (Main Document 57 replaced on 7/27/2020) (zeg).
July 7, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Gregory Mott on behalf of CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY (Mott, W.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Woodrum on behalf of CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY (Woodrum, John)
June 5, 2020 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01095. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 4, 2020 CASES ASSOCIATED: Create association to 1:16-cv-12506. (mk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH CIVIL ACTION NO.: 1:16-cv-12506 AS OF JUNE 4, 2020. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED THEREIN. (mk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, CONSOL's 79 motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, the Subsidiaries' 98 first motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, the Subsidiaries' 111 second motion to dismiss Count II is GRANTED, plaintiffs' 97 motion to consolidate is GRANTED, and the Subsidiaries' 111 motion to transfer Count I is GRANTED. The court transfers the remaining claim pending in this case and all claims in the now-consolidated parallel Second WDPa Suit, Helvetia Coal Co. v. UMWA, No. 1:18-cv-01095 (S.D.W. Va. filed Oct. 31, 2017) to the District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 6/4/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (mk [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY by CONSOL Amonate Facility, LLC, Helvetia Coal Company, Island Creek Coal Company, Laurel Run Mining Company to #50 Memorandum In Opposition. (Fox, Jan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 51 UNOPPOSED MOTION by CONSOL Amonate Facility, LLC, Helvetia Coal Company, Island Creek Coal Company, Laurel Run Mining Company to Extend Time to File Reply to #50 Memorandum In Opposition to April 20, 2020 (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Fox, Jan) (Modified on 4/8/2020 to remove motion to extend time to file document event) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 50 OPPOSITION by United Mine Workers of America, International Union in opposition to #46 MOTION by CONSOL Amonate Facility, LLC, Helvetia Coal Company, Island Creek Coal Company, Laurel Run Mining Company to Transfer Venue in the Interest of Convenience and Justice (Fagan, Kevin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant's #48 MOTION to Extend Time to File its Response to Plaintiffs' #46 MOTION to Transfer Venue. Defendant's deadline to file its Response is extended to 4/3/2020. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 3/9/2020. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 48 UNOPPOSED MOTION by United Mine Workers of America, International Union for Enlargement of Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiffs' #46 Motion to Transfer Venue (Donnelly, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by CONSOL Amonate Facility, LLC, Helvetia Coal Company, Island Creek Coal Company, Laurel Run Mining Company in support of #46 MOTION by CONSOL Amonate Facility, LLC, Helvetia Coal Company, Island Creek Coal Company, Laurel Run Mining Company to Transfer Venue in the Interest of Convenience and Justice (Woodrum, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION by CONSOL Amonate Facility, LLC, Helvetia Coal Company, Island Creek Coal Company, Laurel Run Mining Company to Transfer Venue in the Interest of Convenience and Justice (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Woodrum, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: For reasons appearing to the court, the #43 Amended Order and Notice entered on 8/8/2018 is hereby vacated and the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/31/2018 is cancelled. The court will enter a new Order and Notice once the court rules on plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases, and defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed in CA No. 1:16-cv-12506. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 10/3/2018. (cc: counsel of record) (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: For reasons appearing to the court, the Scheduling Conference shall be held on 10/31/2018 at 04:00 PM in Bluefield. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 10/3/2018. (cc: counsel of record) (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 *VACATED* PURSUANT TO #45 ORDER ENTERED 10/3/2018: AMENDED ORDER AND NOTICE: For reasons appearing to the court, the Order and Notice entered in this case on 6/29/2018 is amended as follows: Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/16/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/23/2018. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 10/30/2018 in Bluefield. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/6/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/13/2018. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 8/8/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk) (Modified on 10/4/2018 to note order has been vacated) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 42 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by United Mine Workers of America, International Union. (Donnelly, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles F. Donnelly on behalf of United Mine Workers of America, International Union. (Donnelly, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 40 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by CONSOL Amonate Facility, LLC, Helvetia Coal Company, Island Creek Coal Company, Laurel Run Mining Company. (Fox, Jan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jan L. Fox on behalf of CONSOL Amonate Facility, LLC, Helvetia Coal Company, Island Creek Coal Company, Laurel Run Mining Company. (Fox, Jan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AND NOTICE: Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting is 7/30/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting is 8/6/2018. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 8/13/2018 in Bluefield before the undersigned. Entry of Scheduling Order by 8/20/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 8/28/2018. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 6/29/2018. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 37 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 28, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 36 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:17-cv-01417. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court finds that the first-filed rule dictates that this action be transferred to the Southern District of West Virginia forthwith. The Court declines to consider the Union's arguments to dismiss Counts Three and Five. Therefore, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Jurisdiction (Doc. #28 ) is GRANTED insofar as the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia for consideration by that Court as to whether consolidation with United Mine Workers of America v. CONSOL Energy, Inc., 16-CV-12506 (S.D. W.Va.) is appropriate. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Surreply, filed on June 14, 2018 (Doc. #33 ), is DENIED as moot. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/26/18. (rdl) Corrected on 6/27/2018 to include the word "forthwith." (rdl) (Main Document 35 replaced on 6/27/2018) (rdl). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Address Defendant UMWA's New Facts filed by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Traynor, Arthur) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Address Defendant UMWA's New Facts by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply Addressing Defendant UMWA's New Facts, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order) (Woodrum, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint, by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Traynor, Arthur) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer Case, filed by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order) (Woodrum, John) Modified on 1/31/2018 to edit docket text. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 11, 2018 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer Case, by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Traynor, Arthur) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 11, 2018 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer Case. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney Traynor is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 29 BRIEF in Support re #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer Case, Under the First Filed Rule filed by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit November 10, 2106 ROD Filing, #2 Exhibit October 31, 2017 ROD Decision) (Traynor, Arthur) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to the First-Filed Rule by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Traynor, Arthur)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. At the request of counsel, Defendants' answer deadline is extended to 1/10/18. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/21/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss. Given that Plaintiffs have filed an Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #15 ) is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by 1/3/18. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/20/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION, filed by HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY, CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Woodrum, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael J. Sweeney terminated. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/19/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
December 18, 2017 Filing 22 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order) (Woodrum, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
December 18, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger L. Puz on behalf of CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. (Puz, Rodger) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Traynor, Arthur) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 19 Errata re #15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. Reason for Correction: Added Signature of Filer. (Traynor, Arthur) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 29, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney Traynor advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(3) and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney Traynor advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief In Support of Motions to Dismiss. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney Traynor advised of signature requirements. Attorney Traynor to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support re Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. "Document previously filed electronically" (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 28, 2017 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue pursuant to Rule 12(b)(3) re #1 Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Filed with document #15 ) (ksa) Modified on 11/29/2017 to add additional docket text. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Response re #15 Motion to Dismiss. Consistent with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/JudgeBissoon-Chamber-Rules-Revised-20170214.pdf), Plaintiff's response is due by 12/18/2017. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, and no briefing schedule will issue. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 12/8/17. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/28/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Arthur R. Traynor III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/28/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under the First Filed Rule by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Traynor, Arthur) Modified on 11/29/2017 ERROR: MULTIPLE RELIEF DOCUMENT FILED AS ONE RELIEF; RE-FILED BY COURT. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Arthur R. Traynor III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4542351) by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Traynor, Arthur) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Healey on behalf of UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Healey, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan M. Block on behalf of UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION. (Block, Megan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 10, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY, CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY. UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION served on 11/9/2017, answer due 11/30/2017. (Woodrum, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 10, 2017 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibit 1, Civil Cover Sheet, Order ECF No. #2 served on Cecil Roberts, President, United Mine Workers of America, International Union on November 8, 2017, filed by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. (Woodrum, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 9 Errata re #8 Amended Document PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Missing text within the body of Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT PLAINTIFFS' CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. Amendment to #3 Disclosure Statement,. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION (gmp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons to Charles F. Donnelly, #2 Summons to Cecil Roberts) (Woodrum, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for John R. Woodrum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/3/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney John R. Woodrum to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4518933) by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John R. Woodrum, #2 Proposed Order) (Woodrum, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying CONSOL Energy, Inc.; CNX Coal Resources LP; CONE Midstream Partners LP as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 2, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/9/2017. (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) motions to dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/2/17. (jhi) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Vacate an Arbitration Award against UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4515348), filed by HELVETIA COAL COMPANY, LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY, CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC, ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons for Arthur Traynor) (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/28/2018.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HELVETIA COAL COMPANY et al v. UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSOL AMONATE FACILITY, LLC
Represented By: W. Gregory Mott
Represented By: John R. Woodrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREL RUN MINING COMPANY
Represented By: W. Gregory Mott
Represented By: John R. Woodrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELVETIA COAL COMPANY
Represented By: W. Gregory Mott
Represented By: John R. Woodrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISLAND CREEK COAL COMPANY
Represented By: W. Gregory Mott
Represented By: John R. Woodrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Deborah Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?