ROBINSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ROBINSON
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01482
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to #7 by 8/21/2020. (dot)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #7 Amended Complaint, in light of which the Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant's pending #5 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by no later than AUGUST 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 3, 2020. (lcckk1)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION with Jury Demand filed by ANTHONY ROBINSON. (Attachments: #1 Marked Up Version of First Amended Complaint)(Styles, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTENT TO AMEND COMPLAINT by ANTHONY ROBINSON re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , Order, Set/Reset Deadlines (Styles, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/24/2020; Reply due by 7/31/2020. (kt)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the #5 Motion on or before JULY 24, 2020; Defendant shall file any reply on or before JULY 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 13, 2020. (lccck1)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/10/2020. (DM)
June 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to #1 due by 7/13/2020. (dot)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's #3 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Defendant seeks a 31-day extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in order to consult with agency counsel and explore whether the case may be resolved without further litigation. Plaintiff consents to the requested relief. Accordingly, for good cause shown and with Plaintiff's consent, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than JULY 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 9, 2020. (lccck1)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the #1 Notice of Removal. It appears that Defendant did not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint before removal. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2) in calculating the time period for answering or otherwise responding to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 8, 2020. (lccck1)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (adh, )
June 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2019 CA 003345 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cirino, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ROBINSON
Represented By: Jeffrey Warren Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?