PRUITT-BOYETTE v. BARR
Petitioner: KEYON PRUITT-BOYETTE
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 1:2020cv01492
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Receipt on 07/02/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 4:20-cv-01122 sent by Middle District of Pennsylvania. (zrdj)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred to the USDC for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, pursuant to the Court Order entered 06/26/2020. Sent to Court via extraction. (zjf)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/26/2020. (jag)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616103281.) filed by KEYON PRUITT-BOYETTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRUITT-BOYETTE v. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KEYON PRUITT-BOYETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?