G. Y. J. P. v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: G. Y. J. P.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, RODNEY S. SCOTT, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, TODD C. OWEN and MARK A. MORGAN
Case Number: 1:2020cv01511
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to opposition to motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF. (Snell, Kevin)
September 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' reply brief due by 9/3/2020. (zhmc)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #42 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their reply brief, if any, on or before September 3, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/1/2020. (lctnm2)
September 1, 2020 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Senanayake, Tanya)
September 1, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya D. Senanayake on behalf of All Defendants (Senanayake, Tanya)
August 26, 2020 Filing 40 Memorandum in opposition to re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by G. Y. J. P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee) Modified docket event/text on 8/27/2020 (eg).
August 21, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla Vargas on behalf of G. Y. J. P. (Vargas, Karla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean)
August 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 8/17/2020. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 8/26/2020. Defendant's Reply due by 9/2/2020. (zhmc)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #37 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. The parties are hereby ORDERED to adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due on or before August 17, 2020. Plaintiff's Opposition is due on or before August 26, 2020. Defendants' Reply is due on or before September 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/10/2020. (lctnm1)
August 6, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by G. Y. J. P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee)
August 5, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Pon Harrold on behalf of G. Y. J. P. (Harrold, Adrienne)
August 5, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Russell on behalf of G. Y. J. P. (Russell, Morgan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Gelernt on behalf of G. Y. J. P. (Gelernt, Lee)
August 5, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Antonio Galindo on behalf of G. Y. J. P. (Galindo, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Bonggyun Kang on behalf of G. Y. J. P. (Kang, Stephen)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying Plaintiff's #25 Motion for Expedited Scheduling Order and Motion to Designate Case as Related. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/21/2020. (lctnm1) Modified on 7/21/2020 to edit event title. (hmc)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 , and #22 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/20/2020. (lctnm1)
July 19, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re #25 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by G. Y. J. P.. (Perez, Celso)
July 17, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition to re #25 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) Modified docket event/text on 7/17/2020 (eg).
July 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order due by 7/17/2020. (ztg)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's #26 Motion to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order on or before July 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/13/2020. (lctnm1)
July 11, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants (Snell, Kevin)
July 10, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
July 10, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Scheduling Order by G. Y. J. P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Motion for Scheduling Order)(Perez, Celso)
July 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Thomas Craigmyle on behalf of All Defendants (Craigmyle, Bradley)
July 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of All Defendants (Lin, Jean)
July 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Morgan Russell, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7325620. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
July 10, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cody Wofsy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7325567. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
July 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Galindo, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7325528. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
July 10, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adrienne Harrold, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7325444. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
July 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen B. Kang, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7325314. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lee Gelernt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7325172. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
July 8, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW T. ALBENCE served on 6/30/2020; ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 6/30/2020; MARK A. MORGAN served on 6/30/2020; TODD C. OWEN served on 6/30/2020; ROBERT R. REDFIELD served on 7/1/2020; RODNEY S. SCOTT served on 6/30/2020; HEIDI STIRRUP served on 6/30/2020; CHAD F. WOLF served on 6/30/2020 (Perez, Celso)
July 8, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/29/2020. (Perez, Celso)
July 8, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/30/2020. (Perez, Celso)
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Efren Carlos Olivares on behalf of G. Y. J. P. (Olivares, Efren)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Supplemental NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-01509. (Perez, Celso) Modified event title on 7/1/2020 (znmw).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 and #10 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file notices of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/19/2020. (lctnm1)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karla M. Vargas, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7239562. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Efren C. Olivares, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7238636. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G. Y. J. P. (Perez, Celso)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 ERRATA to Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case by G. Y. J. P. #7 Notice of Related Case filed by G. Y. J. P.. (Perez, Celso)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by G. Y. J. P.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01509. (Perez, Celso)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie L. Crook on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Crook, Jamie)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/10/2020. (lctnm1)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 10, 2020 Payment for #3 Complaint,. ($400; Receipt number ADCDC-7215079). (Perez, Celso)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, MARK A. MORGAN, TODD C. OWEN, ROBERT R. REDFIELD, RODNEY S. SCOTT, HEIDI STIRRUP, CHAD F. WOLF filed by G. Y. J. P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(eg)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym; granting #1 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 6/9/2020. (eg)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym, MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by G. Y. J. P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(zeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G. Y. J. P. v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY S. SCOTT
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDI STIRRUP
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT R. REDFIELD
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD C. OWEN
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. MORGAN
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Craigmyle
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Tanya D. Senanayake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Y. J. P.
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Adrienne Pon Harrold
Represented By: Efren Carlos Olivares
Represented By: Jamie L. Crook
Represented By: Morgan Russell
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Daniel Antonio Galindo
Represented By: Stephen Bonggyun Kang
Represented By: Karla Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?