COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE v. REPUBLIC OF GUINEA
Petitioner: COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE
Respondent: REPUBLIC OF GUINEA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01536
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0202
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to REPUBLIC OF GUINEA served on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goeke, Reginald)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Cherokee Banks on behalf of COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE (Banks, Hannah)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Ted Howes on behalf of COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE (Howes, B.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and petition, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 7/2/2020, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (ztth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2020: #1 Exhibit DHL Labels) (ztth).
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST from Plaintiff for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, petition, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (See Docket Entry #7 to view document) (ztth)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE. (Goeke, Reginald)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Petitioner's #4 , #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys B. Ted Howes and Hannah C. Banks are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Petitioner Compagnie Sahlienne d'Entreprise. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/15/2020. (lctjk1)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to REPUBLIC OF GUINEA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
June 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Hannah C. Banks, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7219360. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hannah C. Banks, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goeke, Reginald)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- B. Ted Howes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7219323. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Ted Howes, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goeke, Reginald)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Suit by COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE (Goeke, Reginald)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE (Goeke, Reginald)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against REPUBLIC OF GUINEA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7219227) filed by COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of B. Ted Howes, #3 Exhibit A to Howes Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Howes Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Howes Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Howes Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Howes Declaration, #8 Memorandum in Support, #9 Notice of Petition, #10 Summons, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Goeke, Reginald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE v. REPUBLIC OF GUINEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COMPAGNIE SAHELIENNE D'ENTREPRISE
Represented By: Reginald R. Goeke
Represented By: Hannah Cherokee Banks
Represented By: B. Ted Howes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: REPUBLIC OF GUINEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?