BUCHANAN et al v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: LINDSAY FIELD, ANN DAGRIN and RADIYA BUCHANAN
Defendant: GREGORY T. MONAHAN, MARK T. ESPER, WILLIAM J. WALKER, JOHN & JANE 1-50 DOES, JAMES M. MURRAY, WILLIAM P. BARR and DONALD J. TRUMP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01542
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/19/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/18/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM P. BARR served on 6/19/2020; MARK T. ESPER served on 6/19/2020; GREGORY T. MONAHAN served on 6/19/2020; JAMES M. MURRAY served on 6/19/2020; DONALD J. TRUMP served on 6/19/2020; WILLIAM J. WALKER served on 6/19/2020 (Williams, Greta)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Ross Crain on behalf of RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Crain, Lee)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda LeSavage on behalf of RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (LeSavage, Amanda)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M. Champion on behalf of RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Champion, Anne)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mylan L. Denerstein on behalf of RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Denerstein, Mylan)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Michelle Marquart on behalf of RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Marquart, Katherine)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy M. Mastro on behalf of RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Mastro, Randy)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Orin Samuel Snyder on behalf of RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Snyder, Orin)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave for Attorney Lee Crain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 18, 2020. (lcdlf1)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave for Attorney Mylan Denerstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 18, 2020. (lcdlf1)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave for Attorney Randy M. Mastro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 18, 2020. (lcdlf1)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave for Attorney Katherine Marquart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 18, 2020. (lcdlf1)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave for Attorney Orin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 18, 2020. (lcdlf1)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave for Attorney Amanda LeSavage to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 18, 2020. (lcdlf1) (lcdlf1, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave for Attorney Anne Champion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 18, 2020. (lcdlf1)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- RANDY M. MASTRO, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7236924. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Randy M. Mastro, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Greta)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- ORIN SNYDER, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7236919. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Orin Snyder, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Greta)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- MYLAN DENERSTEIN, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7236915. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mylan Denerstein, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Greta)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- LEE CRAIN, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7236909. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee Crain, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Greta)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- KATHERINE MARQUART, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7236907. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine Marquart, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Greta)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- AMANDA LeSAVAGE, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7236902. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda LeSavage, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Greta)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- ANNE CHAMPION, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7236885. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne Champion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Greta)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, MARK T. ESPER, GREGORY T. MONAHAN, JAMES M. MURRAY, DONALD J. TRUMP, WILLIAM J. WALKER, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD. Case related to Case No. Padilla v. Bernhardt, et al., 1:20-cv-01517. (Williams, Greta)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RADIYA BUCHANAN, ANN DAGRIN, LINDSAY FIELD. Case related to Case No. Black Lives Matter, D.C., et al. v. Donald J. Trump, et al., 1:20-cv-01469-DLF. (Williams, Greta)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, JOHN & JANE 1-50 DOES, MARK T. ESPER, GREGORY T. MONAHAN, JAMES M. MURRAY, DONALD J. TRUMP, WILLIAM J. WALKER with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7220930) filed by LINDSAY FIELD, ANN DAGRIN, RADIYA BUCHANAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - U.S. Attorney General, D.C., #3 Summons - William P. Barr - individual capacity, #4 Summons - William P. Barr - official capacity, #5 Summons - Mark T. Esper - individual capacity, #6 Summons - Mark T. Esper - official capacity, #7 Summons - Gregory T. Monahan - individual capacity, #8 Summons - Gregory T. Monahan -official capacity, #9 Summons - James M. Murray - individual capacity, #10 Summons - James M. Murray - official capacity, #11 Summons - Donald J. Trump - official capacity, #12 Summons - William J. Walker - individual capacity, #13 Summons - William J. Walker - official capacity)(Williams, Greta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCHANAN et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY T. MONAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK T. ESPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM J. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN & JANE 1-50 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES M. MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSAY FIELD
Represented By: Greta B. Williams
Represented By: Amanda LeSavage
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Anne M. Champion
Represented By: Orin Samuel Snyder
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN DAGRIN
Represented By: Greta B. Williams
Represented By: Amanda LeSavage
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Anne M. Champion
Represented By: Orin Samuel Snyder
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RADIYA BUCHANAN
Represented By: Greta B. Williams
Represented By: Amanda LeSavage
Represented By: Randy M. Mastro
Represented By: Mylan L. Denerstein
Represented By: Anne M. Champion
Represented By: Orin Samuel Snyder
Represented By: Lee Ross Crain
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Marquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?