CLEMONS v. CVS PHARMACY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: FRANCES CLEMONS
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY, INC., ABC CORPORATIONS 6-10 and JOHN, 1-5 DOES
Case Number: 1:2020cv01551
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for August 21, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The conference will take place by telephone. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/20/2020. (lctnm1)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by CVS PHARMACY, INC..(Burns, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 7/17/2020. (hmc)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Consent Motion to Extend the Deadline for Filing an Answer. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 17, 2020. Further requests for extension will be disfavored. The Court's Minute Order to Show Cause (June 30, 2020) is VACATED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/30/2020, nunc pro tunc to 6/24/2020. (lctnm1)
June 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to the Court's Show Cause Order due by 7/7/2020. (hmc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Burns, Scott)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED ON 6/30/2020.....MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s time to file a response to the Complaint expired on June 24, 2020. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2)(C). Yet the Defendant has filed no such response nor has the Plaintiff filed for entry of default. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall, by July 7, 2020, SHOW CAUSE as to why the claims against the Defendant should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. This Show Cause Order may be fulfilled by invoking the appropriate procedures for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action, without further notice, for failure to prosecute. See LCvR 83.23. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/30/2020. (lctnm1) Modified on 7/1/2020 (hmc).
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Patrick Burns on behalf of CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Burns, Scott)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/17/2020. (lctnm1)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zmc)
June 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Receipt on 6/16/2020 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2020 CA 001632 B. (eg)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CVS PHARMACY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Other Affiliate CVS PHARMACY, L.L.C. for CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (znmw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Amended Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Amended Corporate Disclosure)(Daiutolo, Diane V.)
June 12, 2020 Payment for #1 Notice of Removal,. ($400; Receipt number ADCDC-7223952). (Thomas, Scott)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 001632 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Superior Court Documents Complaint and Summons, #4 Superior Court Documents Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Daiutolo, Diane V.) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2020) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLEMONS v. CVS PHARMACY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES CLEMONS
Represented By: Jalil D Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: Scott Anthony Thomas
Represented By: Scott Patrick Burns
Represented By: Diane V. Daiutolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN, 1-5 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?