DAVIS v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: ANGELA DAVIS
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. and COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01552
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Receipt on 07/02/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:20-cv-08197 sent by District of New Jersey. (zrdj)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of New Jersey, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/2/2020; Sent to Court via extraction. (ztnr)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 EMAIL dated 7/2/2020 from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-218) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2738) (ztnr)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Tobias Locke on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Locke, Thomas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.1(b) by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (ztth)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
June 12, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANGELA DAVIS. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01056-RC and MDL No. 3:16-md-02738-FLW-LHG. (Parfitt, Michelle)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7224045) filed by ANGELA DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1-J&J, #3 Summons 2-JJCC, #4 Summons 3-PCPC)(Parfitt, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA DAVIS
Represented By: Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Represented By: Thomas Tobias Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Thomas Tobias Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?