UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOLTON Featured Case

Plaintiff United States of America sued Defendant John R. Bolton, a former National Security Advisor, over the impending publication of his book "The Room Where it Happened." Plaintiff alleged that the Bolton breached a Classified Information Nondisclosure Agreement, violated a prepublication review requirement, and disseminated classified information in the publication.

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JOHN R. BOLTON
Petitioner: ARTHUR WEST
Amicus Curiae: PEN AMERICAN CENTER, INC., WASHINGTON POST, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS and KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2020cv01580
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by JOHN R. BOLTON.(Cooper, Charles)
October 1, 2020 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/01/2020. (lcrcl2)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying #40 Motion to Dismiss; Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 10/15/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/01/2020. (lcrcl2)
September 25, 2020 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Judge Royce C. Lamberth, held on 9-24-2020. Page Numbers: 1 - 108. Date of Issuance: 9-25-2020. Court Reporter: Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2020.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2020 Minute Entry for Video Motion Hearing held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/24/2020. Oral arguments submitted on Defendant's Motion #40 to Dismiss; Defendant's Motion #49 to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) and Plaintiff's Motion #44 for Summary Judgment. Motions taken under advisement; forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (lsj)
September 23, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING IN SUPPORT OF PENDING MOTIONS by JOHN R. BOLTON re #49 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #40 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles)
September 17, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bandy Dickey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dickey, Jennifer)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are to appear before the Court for a hearing on pending motions. The motions hearing is set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 AM and will proceed by videoconferencing for the parties, and by telephone for members of the public. The parties will receive a separate notification providing connection instructions. Pursuant to Standing Order 20-19 (BAH), the Court will provide access for the public to participate in the hearing on the motion. It is ORDERED that the participants using the public access telephone line shall adhere to the rules set forth in Standing Order 20-20 (BAH), available on the Court's website. Toll Free Number: 888-636-3807; Access Code: 6967853 It is further ORDERED, that in the event the public line reaches its maximum capacity, the public may connect to the hearing utilizing the secondary access line at Toll Free Number: 877-336-1831; Access Code: 9688268. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/16/2020. (lcrcl2)
September 11, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney David Michael Morrell terminated. (Morrell, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY to opposition to motion re #49 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN R. BOLTON. (Cooper, Charles)
September 3, 2020 Filing 50 Memorandum in opposition to re #49 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Van Horn, Daniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Charles J. Cooper, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
August 14, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY to opposition to motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN R. BOLTON. (Cooper, Charles)
August 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/20/2020 and Replies due by 9/3/2020. (lsj)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/3/20. (lcrcl1)
August 1, 2020 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #40 MOTION to Dismiss ; Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/31/2020. (lcmb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Affidavit 2d Mitman Decl., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 43 Memorandum in opposition to re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - June 16, 2020 Letter, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint; Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/16/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/02/2020. (lcmb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Ohlendorf on behalf of JOHN R. BOLTON (Ohlendorf, John)
June 29, 2020 Filing 36 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN R. BOLTON served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Van Horn, Daniel)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/29/20. (lcrcl1)
June 26, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Van Horn, Daniel)
June 23, 2020 Filing 34 Memorandum in opposition to re #25 MOTION for Access to Classified Hearing and Materials re #4 Notice (Other) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Van Horn, Daniel)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #33 Motion to Intervene as MOOT. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/22/20. (lcrcl1)
June 20, 2020 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Judge Royce C. Lamberth, held on 6-19-2020; Page Numbers: 1 - 66. Date of Issuance: 6-20-2020. Court Reporter: Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2020.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth) (Main Document 28 replaced on 6/22/2020 to correct date of hearing) (zjf).
June 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #3 Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/20/20. (lcrcl1)
June 19, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Lodging Classified Document by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Van Horn, Daniel)
June 19, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Access to Classified Hearing and Materials re #4 Notice (Other) by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
June 19, 2020 Minute Entry for Ex Parte In Camera CIPA Hearing held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/19/2020. Plaintiff's Counsel present: David Michael Morrell and Michael Sherwin. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (lsj)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/19/2020. (lcrcl3)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/19/2020. (lcrcl3)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/19/2020. (lcrcl3)
June 19, 2020 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/19/2020. Oral arguments submitted on Plaintiff's Motion #3 for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion taken under advisement; forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (zlsj)
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Spitzer, Arthur)
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of PEN AMERICAN CENTER, INC. (Boutrous, Theodore)
June 19, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #15 Notice of Appearance; emailed to tboutrous@gibsondunn.com, cc'd 40 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must change address via Pacer (zjf, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN R. BOLTON filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Van Horn, Daniel)
June 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Max Kaufman on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Kaufman, Brett)
June 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. McGill on behalf of PEN American Center, Inc. (McGill, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of PEN American Center, Inc. (Boutrous, Theodore)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce D. Brown on behalf of ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, WASHINGTON POST (Brown, Bruce)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Brief Amici Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Brett)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KatieLynn Boyd Townsend on behalf of ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, WASHINGTON POST (Townsend, KatieLynn)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, WASHINGTON POST (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by PEN American Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore)
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN R. BOLTON. (See Docket Entry #9 to view document) (zjf)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by JOHN R. BOLTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bolton Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Kirk Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - SCI NDA, #4 Exhibit D - Classified Info NDA, #5 Exhibit E - Email of 2019-12-30, #6 Exhibit F - Letter of 2019-12-30, #7 Exhibit G - Email of 2019-12-30, #8 Exhibit H - Letter of 2020-01-23, #9 Exhibit I - Letter of 2020-02-07, #10 Exhibit J - Letter of 2020-02-24, #11 Exhibit K - Email of 2020-03-27, #12 Exhibit L - Letter of 2020-06-08, #13 Exhibit M - Letter of 2020-06-10, #14 Exhibit N - Letter of 2020-06-16, #15 Exhibit O - Notes of Ambassador Bolton, #16 Exhibit P - NSC Comments List, #17 Exhibit Q - Karp Declaration, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Morrell on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Morrell, David)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are to appear before the Court for a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion #3 for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2020 at 1:00 PM will proceed by videoconferencing for the parties, and by telephone for the members of the public. The parties will receive a separate notification providing connection instructions. Pursuant to Standing Order 20-19 (BAH), the Court will provide access for the public to participate in the hearing on the motion. It is ORDERED that the participants using the public access telephone line shall adhere to the rules set forth in Standing Order 20-20 (BAH), available on the Court's website. Toll Free Number: 888-636-3807; Access Code: 6967853 It is further ORDERED, that in the event the public line reaches its maximum capacity, the public may connect to the hearing utilizing the secondary access line at Toll Free Number: 877-336-1831; Access Code: 9688268.SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/18/2020. (lsj)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Kirk on behalf of JOHN R. BOLTON (Kirk, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Justin Cooper on behalf of JOHN R. BOLTON (Cooper, Charles)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lodging Classified Declarations by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Van Horn, Daniel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Ellis Decl.), #2 Affidavit (Evanina Decl.), #3 Affidavit (Mitman Decl.), #4 Affidavit (Nakasone Decl.), #5 Affidavit (Ratcliffe Decl.), #6 Exhibit A (Security Agmts.), #7 Exhibit B (Memo. of 9/13/2019), #8 Exhibit C (Letter of 9/10/2019), #9 Exhibit D (Letter of 12/30/2019), #10 Exhibit E (Letter of 1/23/2020), #11 Exhibit F (Letter of 2/7/2020), #12 Exhibit G (Letter of 2/24/2020), #13 Exhibit H (Email of 3/27/2020), #14 Exhibit I (Email of 5/7/2020), #15 Exhibit J (Letter of 6/8/2020), #16 Exhibit K (Letter of 6/10/2020), #17 Exhibit L (Letter of 6/11/2020), #18 Exhibit M (Letter of 6/16/2020), #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Daniel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JOHN R. BOLTON. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
June 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN R. BOLTON (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Security Agmts.), #2 Exhibit B (Memo. of 9/13/2019), #3 Exhibit C (Letter of 9/10/2019), #4 Exhibit D (Letter of 12/30/2019), #5 Exhibit E (Letter of 1/23/2020), #6 Exhibit F (NY Times Article of 1/26/2020), #7 Exhibit G (Wash. Post Article of 1/27/2020), #8 Exhibit H (Letter of 2/7/2020), #9 Exhibit I (Letter of 2/24/2020), #10 Exhibit J (CNN Article of 3/3/2020), #11 Exhibit K (Email of 3/27/2020), #12 Exhibit L (Politico Article of 4/29/2020), #13 Exhibit M (Email of 5/7/2020), #14 Exhibit N (Wash. Post Article of 6/7/2020), #15 Exhibit O (Letter of 6/8/2020), #16 Exhibit P (Letter of 6/10/2020), #17 Exhibit Q (Letter of 6/11/2020), #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Summons)(Van Horn, Daniel)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN R. BOLTON (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Security Agmts.), # 2 Exhibit B (Memo. of 9/13/2019), # 3 Exhibit C (Letter of 9/10/2019), # 4 Exhibit D (Letter of 12/30/2019), # 5 Exhibit E (Letter of 1/23/2020), # 6 Exhibit F (NY Times Article of 1/26/2020), # 7 Exhibit G (Wash. Post Article of 1/27/2020), # 8 Exhibit H (Letter of 2/7/2020), # 9 Exhibit I (Letter of 2/24/2020), # 10 Exhibit J (CNN Article of 3/3/2020), # 11 Exhibit K (Email of 3/27/2020), # 12 Exhibit L (Politico Article of 4/29/2020), # 13 Exhibit M (Email of 5/7/2020), # 14 Exhibit N (Wash. Post Article of 6/7/2020), # 15 Exhibit O (Letter of 6/8/2020), # 16 Exhibit P (Letter of 6/10/2020), # 17 Exhibit Q (Letter of 6/11/2020), # 18 Civil Cover Sheet, # 19 Summons)(Van Horn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOLTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R. BOLTON
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: John D. Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel Franklin Van Horn
Represented By: David Michael Morrell
Represented By: Jennifer Bandy Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PEN AMERICAN CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D. McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASHINGTON POST
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC.
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ARTHUR WEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?