June 16, 2021 |
Filing 72
STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Gardner, Joshua)
|
April 8, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Production of Discovery Plan due by 6/4/2021. Meet & Confer Statement due by 6/18/2021. Motion for Protective Order due by 7/2/2021. Responses to Motion/Objections due by 7/16/2021. Replies to Responses due by 7/23/2021. Discovery/Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (lsj)
|
April 7, 2021 |
Filing 71
ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures and Discovery Plan due by 6/4/2021; Meet & Confer Statement due by 6/18/2021; Objections/Motion for Protective Order due by 7/2/2021; Response due by 7/16/2021; Reply due by 7/23/2021; Discovery Hearing set for 8/4/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/7/2021. (lcrcl2)
|
April 5, 2021 |
Filing 70
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
|
April 4, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #69 Status Report; emailed to joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov, cc'd 48 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Same Document using the MOTIONS event (zjf, )
|
April 2, 2021 |
Filing 69
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
|
March 3, 2021 |
Filing 68
ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures and Discovery Plan due by 4/5/2021; Meet & Confer Statement due by 4/19/2021; Objections/Motion for Protective Order due by 5/3/2021; Response due by 5/17/2021; Reply due by 5/24/2021; Discovery Hearing set for 6/1/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/03/2021. (lcrcl2)
|
March 1, 2021 |
Filing 67
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Commence Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
|
February 22, 2021 |
Filing 66
ORDER denying #25 Motion for Access to Classified Hearing and Materials. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/22/2021. (lcrcl2)
|
January 29, 2021 |
Filing 65
ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time.Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery Plan due by 3/3/2021. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 3/3/2021. Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 3/3/2021. Joint Report due by 3/17/2021. Objections to Discovery Plan and Motion for Protective Order due by 3/31/2021. Responses due by 4/14/2021. Replies due by 4/21/2021. Discovery Hearing set for 4/27/2021 at 02:00 PM in TBA before Judge Royce C. Lamberth.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/29/2021. (lcrcl2)
|
January 28, 2021 |
Filing 64
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Commence Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
|
January 25, 2021 |
Filing 63
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Edward Gardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gardner, Joshua)
|
January 25, 2021 |
Filing 62
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brian P. Hudak on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Daniel F. Van Horn (Hudak, Brian)
|
January 14, 2021 |
Filing 61
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/14/2021. (lcrcl2)
|
January 14, 2021 |
Filing 60
ORDER granting #49 Motion to Defer Consideration of #44 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying without prejudice #44 Motion for Summary Judgment. The government may renew its motion after the conclusion of the discovery authorized by this order.Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery Plan due by 2/1/2021. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 2/1/2021. Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 2/1/2021. Joint Report due by 2/15/2021. Objections to Discovery Plan and Motion for Protective Order due by 3/1/2021. Responses due by 3/15/2021 Replies due by 3/22/2021. Discovery Hearing set for 3/26/2021 at 02:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Royce C. Lamberth.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/14/2021. (lcrcl2)
|
January 11, 2021 |
Filing 59
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Jennifer Bandy Dickey terminated. (Dickey, Jennifer)
|
October 15, 2020 |
Filing 58
ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by JOHN R. BOLTON.(Cooper, Charles)
|
October 1, 2020 |
Filing 57
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/01/2020. (lcrcl2)
|
October 1, 2020 |
Filing 56
ORDER denying #40 Motion to Dismiss; Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 10/15/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/01/2020. (lcrcl2)
|
September 25, 2020 |
Filing 55
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Judge Royce C. Lamberth, held on 9-24-2020. Page Numbers: 1 - 108. Date of Issuance: 9-25-2020. Court Reporter: Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2020.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
|
September 24, 2020 |
Minute Entry for Video Motion Hearing held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/24/2020. Oral arguments submitted on Defendant's Motion #40 to Dismiss; Defendant's Motion #49 to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) and Plaintiff's Motion #44 for Summary Judgment. Motions taken under advisement; forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (lsj)
|
September 23, 2020 |
Filing 54
NOTICE OF FILING IN SUPPORT OF PENDING MOTIONS by JOHN R. BOLTON re #49 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #40 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles)
|
September 17, 2020 |
Filing 53
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bandy Dickey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dickey, Jennifer)
|
September 16, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER. The parties are to appear before the Court for a hearing on pending motions. The motions hearing is set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 AM and will proceed by videoconferencing for the parties, and by telephone for members of the public. The parties will receive a separate notification providing connection instructions. Pursuant to Standing Order 20-19 (BAH), the Court will provide access for the public to participate in the hearing on the motion. It is ORDERED that the participants using the public access telephone line shall adhere to the rules set forth in Standing Order 20-20 (BAH), available on the Court's website. Toll Free Number: 888-636-3807; Access Code: 6967853 It is further ORDERED, that in the event the public line reaches its maximum capacity, the public may connect to the hearing utilizing the secondary access line at Toll Free Number: 877-336-1831; Access Code: 9688268. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/16/2020. (lcrcl2)
|
September 11, 2020 |
Filing 52
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney David Michael Morrell terminated. (Morrell, David)
|
September 10, 2020 |
Filing 51
REPLY to opposition to motion re #49 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN R. BOLTON. (Cooper, Charles)
|
September 3, 2020 |
Filing 50
Memorandum in opposition to re #49 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Van Horn, Daniel)
|
August 20, 2020 |
Filing 49
MOTION to Defer Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Charles J. Cooper, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
August 14, 2020 |
Filing 48
REPLY to opposition to motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN R. BOLTON. (Cooper, Charles)
|
August 4, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/20/2020 and Replies due by 9/3/2020. (lsj)
|
August 3, 2020 |
Filing 47
ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/3/20. (lcrcl1)
|
August 1, 2020 |
Filing 46
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
July 31, 2020 |
Filing 45
ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #40 MOTION to Dismiss ; Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/31/2020. (lcmb)
|
July 30, 2020 |
Filing 44
MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Affidavit 2d Mitman Decl., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Daniel)
|
July 30, 2020 |
Filing 43
Memorandum in opposition to re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Daniel)
|
July 30, 2020 |
Filing 42
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
July 16, 2020 |
Filing 40
MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - June 16, 2020 Letter, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
July 2, 2020 |
Filing 39
ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint; Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/16/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/02/2020. (lcmb)
|
July 2, 2020 |
Filing 38
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
July 2, 2020 |
Filing 37
NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Ohlendorf on behalf of JOHN R. BOLTON (Ohlendorf, John)
|
June 29, 2020 |
Filing 36
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN R. BOLTON served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020 (Van Horn, Daniel)
|
June 29, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/29/20. (lcrcl1)
|
June 26, 2020 |
Filing 35
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Van Horn, Daniel)
|
June 23, 2020 |
Filing 34
Memorandum in opposition to re #25 MOTION for Access to Classified Hearing and Materials re #4 Notice (Other) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Van Horn, Daniel)
|
June 22, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER denying #33 Motion to Intervene as MOOT. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/22/20. (lcrcl1)
|
June 20, 2020 |
Filing 28
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Judge Royce C. Lamberth, held on 6-19-2020; Page Numbers: 1 - 66. Date of Issuance: 6-20-2020. Court Reporter: Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2020.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth) (Main Document 28 replaced on 6/22/2020 to correct date of hearing) (zjf).
|
June 20, 2020 |
Filing 27
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #3 Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/20/20. (lcrcl1)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 26
NOTICE of Lodging Classified Document by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Van Horn, Daniel)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 25
MOTION for Access to Classified Hearing and Materials re #4 Notice (Other) by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 24
ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/19/2020. (lcrcl3)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 23
ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/19/2020. (lcrcl3)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 22
ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/19/2020. (lcrcl3)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 21
NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Spitzer, Arthur)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 20
NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of PEN AMERICAN CENTER, INC. (Boutrous, Theodore)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 18
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN R. BOLTON filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Van Horn, Daniel)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 17
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Max Kaufman on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Kaufman, Brett)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 16
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. McGill on behalf of PEN American Center, Inc. (McGill, Matthew)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 15
NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of PEN American Center, Inc. (Boutrous, Theodore)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 14
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce D. Brown on behalf of ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, WASHINGTON POST (Brown, Bruce)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 13
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Brief Amici Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Brett)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 12
NOTICE of Appearance by KatieLynn Boyd Townsend on behalf of ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, WASHINGTON POST (Townsend, KatieLynn)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 11
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, WASHINGTON POST (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing 10
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by PEN American Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore)
|
June 19, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #15 Notice of Appearance; emailed to tboutrous@gibsondunn.com, cc'd 40 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must change address via Pacer (zjf, )
|
June 19, 2020 |
Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/19/2020. Oral arguments submitted on Plaintiff's Motion #3 for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion taken under advisement; forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (zlsj)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Minute Entry for Ex Parte In Camera CIPA Hearing held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/19/2020. Plaintiff's Counsel present: David Michael Morrell and Michael Sherwin. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (lsj)
|
June 18, 2020 |
Filing 19
MEMORANDUM in support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN R. BOLTON. (See Docket Entry #9 to view document) (zjf)
|
June 18, 2020 |
Filing 9
Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by JOHN R. BOLTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bolton Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Kirk Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - SCI NDA, #4 Exhibit D - Classified Info NDA, #5 Exhibit E - Email of 2019-12-30, #6 Exhibit F - Letter of 2019-12-30, #7 Exhibit G - Email of 2019-12-30, #8 Exhibit H - Letter of 2020-01-23, #9 Exhibit I - Letter of 2020-02-07, #10 Exhibit J - Letter of 2020-02-24, #11 Exhibit K - Email of 2020-03-27, #12 Exhibit L - Letter of 2020-06-08, #13 Exhibit M - Letter of 2020-06-10, #14 Exhibit N - Letter of 2020-06-16, #15 Exhibit O - Notes of Ambassador Bolton, #16 Exhibit P - NSC Comments List, #17 Exhibit Q - Karp Declaration, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
June 18, 2020 |
Filing 8
MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN R. BOLTON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
June 18, 2020 |
Filing 7
NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Morrell on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Morrell, David)
|
June 18, 2020 |
Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Kirk on behalf of JOHN R. BOLTON (Kirk, Michael)
|
June 18, 2020 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Justin Cooper on behalf of JOHN R. BOLTON (Cooper, Charles)
|
June 18, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are to appear before the Court for a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion #3 for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2020 at 1:00 PM will proceed by videoconferencing for the parties, and by telephone for the members of the public. The parties will receive a separate notification providing connection instructions. Pursuant to Standing Order 20-19 (BAH), the Court will provide access for the public to participate in the hearing on the motion. It is ORDERED that the participants using the public access telephone line shall adhere to the rules set forth in Standing Order 20-20 (BAH), available on the Court's website. Toll Free Number: 888-636-3807; Access Code: 6967853 It is further ORDERED, that in the event the public line reaches its maximum capacity, the public may connect to the hearing utilizing the secondary access line at Toll Free Number: 877-336-1831; Access Code: 9688268.SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/18/2020. (lsj)
|
June 17, 2020 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Lodging Classified Declarations by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Van Horn, Daniel)
|
June 17, 2020 |
Filing 3
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Ellis Decl.), #2 Affidavit (Evanina Decl.), #3 Affidavit (Mitman Decl.), #4 Affidavit (Nakasone Decl.), #5 Affidavit (Ratcliffe Decl.), #6 Exhibit A (Security Agmts.), #7 Exhibit B (Memo. of 9/13/2019), #8 Exhibit C (Letter of 9/10/2019), #9 Exhibit D (Letter of 12/30/2019), #10 Exhibit E (Letter of 1/23/2020), #11 Exhibit F (Letter of 2/7/2020), #12 Exhibit G (Letter of 2/24/2020), #13 Exhibit H (Email of 3/27/2020), #14 Exhibit I (Email of 5/7/2020), #15 Exhibit J (Letter of 6/8/2020), #16 Exhibit K (Letter of 6/10/2020), #17 Exhibit L (Letter of 6/11/2020), #18 Exhibit M (Letter of 6/16/2020), #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Daniel)
|
June 17, 2020 |
Filing 2
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JOHN R. BOLTON. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
|
June 17, 2020 |
Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb)
|
June 16, 2020 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against JOHN R. BOLTON (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Security Agmts.), #2 Exhibit B (Memo. of 9/13/2019), #3 Exhibit C (Letter of 9/10/2019), #4 Exhibit D (Letter of 12/30/2019), #5 Exhibit E (Letter of 1/23/2020), #6 Exhibit F (NY Times Article of 1/26/2020), #7 Exhibit G (Wash. Post Article of 1/27/2020), #8 Exhibit H (Letter of 2/7/2020), #9 Exhibit I (Letter of 2/24/2020), #10 Exhibit J (CNN Article of 3/3/2020), #11 Exhibit K (Email of 3/27/2020), #12 Exhibit L (Politico Article of 4/29/2020), #13 Exhibit M (Email of 5/7/2020), #14 Exhibit N (Wash. Post Article of 6/7/2020), #15 Exhibit O (Letter of 6/8/2020), #16 Exhibit P (Letter of 6/10/2020), #17 Exhibit Q (Letter of 6/11/2020), #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Summons)(Van Horn, Daniel)
|
June 16, 2020 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against JOHN R. BOLTON (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Security Agmts.), # 2 Exhibit B (Memo. of 9/13/2019), # 3 Exhibit C (Letter of 9/10/2019), # 4 Exhibit D (Letter of 12/30/2019), # 5 Exhibit E (Letter of 1/23/2020), # 6 Exhibit F (NY Times Article of 1/26/2020), # 7 Exhibit G (Wash. Post Article of 1/27/2020), # 8 Exhibit H (Letter of 2/7/2020), # 9 Exhibit I (Letter of 2/24/2020), # 10 Exhibit J (CNN Article of 3/3/2020), # 11 Exhibit K (Email of 3/27/2020), # 12 Exhibit L (Politico Article of 4/29/2020), # 13 Exhibit M (Email of 5/7/2020), # 14 Exhibit N (Wash. Post Article of 6/7/2020), # 15 Exhibit O (Letter of 6/8/2020), # 16 Exhibit P (Letter of 6/10/2020), # 17 Exhibit Q (Letter of 6/11/2020), # 18 Civil Cover Sheet, # 19 Summons)(Van Horn, Daniel)
|