ADVANCED KNOWLEDGE TECH LLC et al v. CUCCINELLI
Plaintiff: VMC SOFT TECHNOLOGIES INC, VUEGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC, KOLLA SOFT INC, ECOVUE SOLUTIONS, MICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC, ASTUTEONE CORP, CORPORATE SOLUTIONS GENERAL INC, VLINK INC, TECKORG INC, V3 TECH SOLUTIONS INC, VENSIT CORP, VASTEK INC, INTERNATIONAL TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS INC, WISE EQUATION SOLUTIONS INC, SMARTWORKS LLC, CDI SOLUTIONS INC, TEK SPIKES LLC, PAX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY INC, INNOVATIVE INTELLIGENT SOLUTIONS, FIREFLY PROS INC, DATASERV INC, AMITI CONSULTING INC, SCHRILL TECHNOLOGIES INC, LORSIV TECHNOLOGIES INC, REDBUD TECHNOLOGIES INC, SIERRA CONSULTING INC, ANVENTA INC, CHELSOFT SOLUTIONS CO, ADVANCED KNOWLEDGE TECH LLC, CLOUD INFO SOLUTIONS INC, TEK NINJAS SOLUTIONS LLC, TEKSKY, CONCEPT SOFTWARE & SERVICES INC, GLORIAN INC, MYTHRI CONSULTING LLC, HORIZON ADVANCED SYSTEMS INC, REAL WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC, CYMANSYS SOLUTIONS LLC, IBM GLOBAL SYSTEMS, TECHIE BRAINS INC, COMPETENT SYSTEMS INC, INVOLGIXS INC, ELAN TECHNOLOGIES INC, INTUITES LLC, S4 CONSULTANTS INC, DEXTRO SOFTWARE SYSTEMS INC, ECOM CONSULTING INC, H-TOWN TECHNOLOGIES INC, ECONSULTANTS INC, INTELLIGROUP USA LTD, GALAXY I TECHNOLOGIES INC, SURYA SYSTEMS INC, MALLA SYSTEMS INC, SPR SOFTWARE SYSTEMS LLC, R2 TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, SAPOT SYSTEMS INC, PRECISION TECHNOLOGIES CORP, SMART IT FRAME LLC, FUTRAN SOLUTIONS INC, IBM GLOBAL SYSTEMS doing business as JOLT TECHNOLOGIES and MALLA SYSTEMS INC doing business as EFULGENT
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 1:2020cv01623
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service)(Wasden, Jonathan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI filed by MALLA SYSTEMS INC, LORSIV TECHNOLOGIES INC, GLORIAN INC, CLOUD INFO SOLUTIONS INC, INNOVATIVE INTELLIGENT SOLUTIONS, ELAN TECHNOLOGIES INC, AMITI CONSULTING INC, ADVANCED KNOWLEDGE TECH LLC, FIREFLY PROS INC, INVOLGIXS INC, ECOVUE SOLUTIONS, SCHRILL TECHNOLOGIES INC, WISE EQUATION SOLUTIONS INC, INTELLIGROUP USA LTD, INTERNATIONAL TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS INC, VASTEK INC, REAL WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC, VUEGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC, GALAXY I TECHNOLOGIES INC, ECOM CONSULTING INC, VLINK INC, SURYA SYSTEMS INC, IBM GLOBAL SYSTEMS, CORPORATE SOLUTIONS GENERAL INC, KOLLA SOFT INC, MICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC, CYMANSYS SOLUTIONS LLC, TEKSKY, SPR SOFTWARE SYSTEMS LLC, S4 CONSULTANTS INC, HORIZON ADVANCED SYSTEMS INC, SMART IT FRAME LLC, DEXTRO SOFTWARE SYSTEMS INC, H-TOWN TECHNOLOGIES INC, INTUITES LLC, CHELSOFT SOLUTIONS CO, TECHIE BRAINS INC, R2 TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, MYTHRI CONSULTING LLC, ANVENTA INC, TECKORG INC, CONCEPT SOFTWARE & SERVICES INC, VENSIT CORP, REDBUD TECHNOLOGIES INC, DATASERV INC, SMARTWORKS LLC, ECONSULTANTS INC, TEK NINJAS SOLUTIONS LLC, PRECISION TECHNOLOGIES CORP, COMPETENT SYSTEMS INC, VMC SOFT TECHNOLOGIES INC, ASTUTEONE CORP, V3 TECH SOLUTIONS INC, SIERRA CONSULTING INC, PAX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY INC, SAPOT SYSTEMS INC, FUTRAN SOLUTIONS INC, TEK SPIKES LLC, CDI SOLUTIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WAC Denials, #2 Exhibit B - EAC Denials, #3 Exhibit C - LIN Denials, #4 Exhibit D - SRC Denials, #5 Exhibit E - WAC Short-term Approvals, #6 Exhibit F- EAC Short-term Approvals, #7 Exhibit G - LIN Short-term Approvals, #8 Exhibit H - SRC Short-term Approvals, #9 Exhibit I - USCIS Policy Memo)(Wasden, Jonathan)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI (Cirino, Paul)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Bruce Banias on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Banias, Bradley)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service)(Wasden, Jonathan)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/22/2020. (lctnm1)
June 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADVANCED KNOWLEDGE TECH LLC, AMITI CONSULTING INC, ANVENTA INC, ASTUTEONE CORP, CDI SOLUTIONS INC, CHELSOFT SOLUTIONS CO, CLOUD INFO SOLUTIONS INC, COMPETENT SYSTEMS INC, CONCEPT SOFTWARE & SERVICES INC, CORPORATE SOLUTIONS GENERAL INC, CYMANSYS SOLUTIONS LLC, DATASERV INC, DEXTRO SOFTWARE SYSTEMS INC, ECOM CONSULTING INC, ECONSULTANTS INC, ECOVUE SOLUTIONS, ELAN TECHNOLOGIES INC, FIREFLY PROS INC, FUTRAN SOLUTIONS INC, GALAXY I TECHNOLOGIES INC, GLORIAN INC, H-TOWN TECHNOLOGIES INC, HORIZON ADVANCED SYSTEMS INC, IBM GLOBAL SYSTEMS, INNOVATIVE INTELLIGENT SOLUTIONS, INTELLIGROUP USA LTD, INTERNATIONAL TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS INC, INTUITES LLC, INVOLGIXS INC, KOLLA SOFT INC, LORSIV TECHNOLOGIES INC, MALLA SYSTEMS INC, MICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC, MYTHRI CONSULTING LLC, PAX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY INC, PRECISION TECHNOLOGIES CORP, R2 TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, REAL WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC, REDBUD TECHNOLOGIES INC, S4 CONSULTANTS INC, SAPOT SYSTEMS INC, SCHRILL TECHNOLOGIES INC, SIERRA CONSULTING INC, SMART IT FRAME LLC, SMARTWORKS LLC, SPR SOFTWARE SYSTEMS LLC, SURYA SYSTEMS INC, TECHIE BRAINS INC, TECKORG INC, TEK NINJAS SOLUTIONS LLC, TEK SPIKES LLC, TEKSKY, V3 TECH SOLUTIONS INC, VASTEK INC, VENSIT CORP, VLINK INC, VMC SOFT TECHNOLOGIES INC, VUEGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC, WISE EQUATION SOLUTIONS INC (Wasden, Jonathan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7248528) filed by MALLA SYSTEMS INC, LORSIV TECHNOLOGIES INC, GLORIAN INC, CLOUD INFO SOLUTIONS INC, INNOVATIVE INTELLIGENT SOLUTIONS, ELAN TECHNOLOGIES INC, AMITI CONSULTING INC, ADVANCED KNOWLEDGE TECH LLC, FIREFLY PROS INC, INVOLGIXS INC, ECOVUE SOLUTIONS, SCHRILL TECHNOLOGIES INC, WISE EQUATION SOLUTIONS INC, INTELLIGROUP USA LTD, INTERNATIONAL TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS INC, VASTEK INC, REAL WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC, VUEGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC, GALAXY I TECHNOLOGIES INC, ECOM CONSULTING INC, VLINK INC, SURYA SYSTEMS INC, IBM GLOBAL SYSTEMS, CORPORATE SOLUTIONS GENERAL INC, KOLLA SOFT INC, MICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC, CYMANSYS SOLUTIONS LLC, TEKSKY, SPR SOFTWARE SYSTEMS LLC, S4 CONSULTANTS INC, HORIZON ADVANCED SYSTEMS INC, SMART IT FRAME LLC, DEXTRO SOFTWARE SYSTEMS INC, H-TOWN TECHNOLOGIES INC, INTUITES LLC, CHELSOFT SOLUTIONS CO, TECHIE BRAINS INC, R2 TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, MYTHRI CONSULTING LLC, ANVENTA INC, TECKORG INC, CONCEPT SOFTWARE & SERVICES INC, VENSIT CORP, REDBUD TECHNOLOGIES INC, DATASERV INC, SMARTWORKS LLC, ECONSULTANTS INC, TEK NINJAS SOLUTIONS LLC, PRECISION TECHNOLOGIES CORP, COMPETENT SYSTEMS INC, VMC SOFT TECHNOLOGIES INC, ASTUTEONE CORP, V3 TECH SOLUTIONS INC, SIERRA CONSULTING INC, PAX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY INC, SAPOT SYSTEMS INC, FUTRAN SOLUTIONS INC, TEK SPIKES LLC, CDI SOLUTIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- WAC Denials, #2 Exhibit B- EAC Denials, #3 Exhibit C- LIN Denials, #4 Exhibit D- SRC Denials, #5 Exhibit E- WAC Short-term Approvals, #6 Exhibit F- EAC Short-term Approvals, #7 Exhibit G- LIN Short-term Approvals, #8 Exhibit H- SRC Short-term Approvals, #9 Exhibit I- USCIS Policy Memo, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons USAG, #12 Summons USAO, #13 Summons USCIS)(Wasden, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADVANCED KNOWLEDGE TECH LLC et al v. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VMC SOFT TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VUEGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOLLA SOFT INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECOVUE SOLUTIONS
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTUTEONE CORP
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORPORATE SOLUTIONS GENERAL INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VLINK INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TECKORG INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V3 TECH SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VENSIT CORP
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VASTEK INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WISE EQUATION SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMARTWORKS LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CDI SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEK SPIKES LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INNOVATIVE INTELLIGENT SOLUTIONS
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIREFLY PROS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DATASERV INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMITI CONSULTING INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHRILL TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORSIV TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REDBUD TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CONSULTING INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANVENTA INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHELSOFT SOLUTIONS CO
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVANCED KNOWLEDGE TECH LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLOUD INFO SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEK NINJAS SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEKSKY
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONCEPT SOFTWARE & SERVICES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIAN INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYTHRI CONSULTING LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HORIZON ADVANCED SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REAL WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYMANSYS SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBM GLOBAL SYSTEMS
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TECHIE BRAINS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMPETENT SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INVOLGIXS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELAN TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTUITES LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S4 CONSULTANTS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEXTRO SOFTWARE SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECOM CONSULTING INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-TOWN TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECONSULTANTS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTELLIGROUP USA LTD
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALAXY I TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SURYA SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALLA SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPR SOFTWARE SYSTEMS LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R2 TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAPOT SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRECISION TECHNOLOGIES CORP
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART IT FRAME LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUTRAN SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBM GLOBAL SYSTEMS doing business as JOLT TECHNOLOGIES
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALLA SYSTEMS INC doing business as EFULGENT
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasden
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?