WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, INC. et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: WARD CARPENTER, MD, AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS, BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER, THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION, ROBERT BOLAN, MD, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH, RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC, LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY and SARAH HENN, MD, MPH
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA, ROGER SEVERINO and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2020cv01630
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Avra Gliksberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gliksberg, Jamie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Solomon Charles on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Charles, Carl)
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Loewy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loewy, Karen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Khristoph Becker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Becker, Khristoph)
June 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Joy Edelstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Edelstein, Laura)
June 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Francisco Gonzalez-Pagan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JAMIE AVRA GLIKSBERG. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2020. (lcjeb2)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of CARL S. CHARLES. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2020. (lcjeb2) (lcmg)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of KAREN L. LOEWY. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2020. (lcjeb2) (lcmg)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of OMAR GONZALEZ-PAGAN. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2020. (lcjeb2)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of KRISTOPH A. BECKER. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2020. (lcjeb2)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of LAURA J. EDELSTEIN. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2020. (lcjeb2)
June 26, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Vatis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vatis, Michael)
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROGER SEVERINO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
June 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jamie Gliksberg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7260338. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY, ROBERT BOLAN, MD, BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER, WARD CARPENTER, MD, SARAH HENN, MD, MPH, LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER, RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC, THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jamie Gliksberg, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carl S. Charles, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7255870. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY, ROBERT BOLAN, MD, BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER, WARD CARPENTER, MD, SARAH HENN, MD, MPH, LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER, RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC, THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl S. Charles, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen L. Loewy, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7255839. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY, ROBERT BOLAN, MD, BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER, WARD CARPENTER, MD, SARAH HENN, MD, MPH, LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER, RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC, THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karen L. Loewy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Omar Gonzalez-Pagan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7255804. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY, ROBERT BOLAN, MD, BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER, WARD CARPENTER, MD, SARAH HENN, MD, MPH, LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER, RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC, THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Omar Gonzalez-Pagan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Khristoph A. Becker, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7255109. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY, ROBERT BOLAN, MD, BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER, WARD CARPENTER, MD, SARAH HENN, MD, MPH, LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER, RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC, THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Khristoph A. Becker, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura J. Edelstein, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7254978. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY, ROBERT BOLAN, MD, BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER, WARD CARPENTER, MD, SARAH HENN, MD, MPH, LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER, RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC, THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laura J. Edelstein, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY (Dennehy, Johanna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROGER SEVERINO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7253108) filed by SARAH HENN, MD, MPH, BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER, RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC, WARD CARPENTER, MD, LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER, ROBERT BOLAN, MD, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY, THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH, AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 5 Summons Alex M. Azar II, # 6 Summons Roger Severino, # 7 Summons Seema Verma, # 8 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 9 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Dennehy, Johanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, INC. et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARD CARPENTER, MD
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGLP: THE ASSOCIATION OF LGBTQ PSYCHIATRISTS
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADBURY-SULLIVAN LGBT COMMUNITY CENTER
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRANSLATIN@ COALITION
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BOLAN, MD
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, Inc. d/b/a WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY PUMPHREY, D.MIN, LCC, BCC
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOS ANGELES LGBT CENTER
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, INC. d/b/a GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH HENN, MD, MPH
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER SEVERINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?