EBERLE v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: UTHMAN DEYA UD DEEN EBERLE
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI, CHAD WOLF and CHAD F. WOLF
Case Number: 1:2020cv01742
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UTHMAN DEYA UD DEEN EBERLE (Jump, Christina)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2020. (Jump, Christina)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2020. (Jump, Christina)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn H. Brady on behalf of UTHMAN DEYA UD DEEN EBERLE (Brady, Kathryn)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leila E. Mustafa on behalf of UTHMAN DEYA UD DEEN EBERLE (Mustafa, Leila)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH CUCCINELLI, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
June 26, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS and Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7273503) filed by Uthman Deya Ud Deen Eberle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Jump, Christina) Modified event title on 7/1/2020 (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EBERLE v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTHMAN DEYA UD DEEN EBERLE
Represented By: Christina A. Jump
Represented By: Leila E. Mustafa
Represented By: Kathryn H. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?