GILLHAM LLC v. KYRGYZ REPUBLIC
Plaintiff: GILLHAM LLC
Defendant: KYRGYZ REPUBLIC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01795
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 8/13/2020, by FEDEX, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 FedEx Waybill) (ztd)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST from Plaintiff's for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by FEDEX, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (ztd) Modified on 8/13/2020 (ztd). (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #4 TO VIEW.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING re #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #3 Summons Issued Electronically by GILLHAM LLC. (Berger, James)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to KYRGYZ REPUBLIC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GILLHAM LLC (Berger, James)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against KYRGYZ REPUBLIC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7292216) filed by GILLHAM LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Charlene C. Sun, #5 Exhibit A - Award, #6 Exhibit B - Kyrgyzstan Law on Investments, #7 Exhibit C - Assignment Agreement, #8 Exhibit D - Notice of Arbitration)(Berger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILLHAM LLC v. KYRGYZ REPUBLIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYRGYZ REPUBLIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILLHAM LLC
Represented By: James E. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?