BEYOND PESTICIDES v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: BEYOND PESTICIDES
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01815
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by BEYOND PESTICIDES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and for Fees and Costs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Richman, Kim)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Toal on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (Toal, Daniel)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadlines. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/7/2020. (lctjk1)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel J. Toal is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/7/2020. (lctjk1)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Theodore)
July 7, 2020 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zmc)
July 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Appearance . (Wells, Theodore)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Conlon on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (Conlon, Patrick)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (Wells, Theodore)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel J. Toal, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7302236. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Toal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Theodore)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin A. Anderson on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (Anderson, Justin)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia Civil Division, case number 2020 CA 002532 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7301941 filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Wells, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEYOND PESTICIDES v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEYOND PESTICIDES
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Represented By: Justin A. Anderson
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick J. Conlon
Represented By: Daniel John Toal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?