EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. v. SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP
Plaintiff: THE EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. and EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C.
Defendant: SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP
Petitioner: DENNIS BRADY
Case Number: 1:2020cv01852
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #14 plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Dennis Brady shall file a response to #14 plaintiff's motion by not later than September 14, 2020; it is further ORDERED that Mr. Brady's response shall include any additional evidence that San Diego Employment Law Group legally operates as a sole proprietorship owned by Mr. Brady; and it is further ORDERED that the date by which defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint is extended from September 14, 2020 until further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/02/2020. (lcjdb3)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Order, re Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Se by EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Christopher G. Smith, #3 Declaration of Edward F. Roche, #4 Exhibit Numbers 13-23, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Edward)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #12 plaintiff's motion for admission pro hac vice of Philip J. Cardinale, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/01/2020. (lcjdb3)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #11 plaintiff's motion for admission pro hac vice of Christopher G. Smith, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/01/2020. (lcjdb3)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Philip J. Cardinale, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7531751. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Cardinale, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Edward)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher G. Smith, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7531733. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher G. Smith, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Edward)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Proposed Order by DENNIS BRADY, SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP (ztd)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or Responsive Pleading due by 9/14/2020. (zjd)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #10 defendant's motion for leave to appear pro se, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by not later than September 14, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 08/26/2020. (lcjdb3)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Order by DENNIS BRADY (ztd)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE to the Court by EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. re #8 Waiver of Service, (Roche, Edward)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #8 Waiver of Service, was entered in error at the request of counsel. (See Docket Entry #7 for service upon defendant)(zjf)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR.....WAIVER OF SERVICE . SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP waiver sent on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service of Waiver of Service of Summons)(Roche, Edward) Modified on 8/18/2020 to correct date (zjf). Modified on 8/19/2020 (zjf).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Roche, Edward)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Francis Roche on behalf of THE EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. (Roche, Edward)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (adh, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ERRATA to Complaint by THE EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. #1 Complaint, filed by THE EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Corrected))(Roche, Edward)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. (Roche, Edward)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7319618) filed by THE EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-12, #3 Summons)(Roche, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C. v. SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C.
Represented By: Edward Francis Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C.
Represented By: Edward Francis Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN DIEGO EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DENNIS BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?